Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00127
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 19, 2024 1:30 AM CST
Defendant
Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero (1)
Represented By
Sandra S. Lewis
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Stanley Michael Serwatka
Assistant United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/19/2024 2:23 AM CST
Thursday, December 21, 2023
Arrest of Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero (mv) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mv) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero. (mv) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero. (mv) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (bot4) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (bot4) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
5 5 Proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower:Initial Appearance as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero held on 12/22/2023 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 12/28/2023 09:30AM before Judge Leon Schydlower, SPANISH Language Interpreter (T. Saenz) required as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero (Court Reporter ERO.) (bot4) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Stanley Michael Serwatka appearing for USA. . Attorney Stanley Michael Serwatka added to party USA(pty:pla) (Serwatka, Stanley) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sandra S. Lewis appearing for Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero . Attorney Sandra S. Lewis added to party Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero(pty:dft) (Lewis, Sandra) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
ORAL MOTION to Continue Preliminary and Detention Hearings by Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero. (mg2) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING [] Oral Motion to Continue as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero (1) by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower:Miscellaneous Hearing as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero held on 12/28/2023 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero (Court Reporter FTR.) (mg2) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs ORDER RESETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero, ( Detention and Preliminary Hearing reset for 12/28/2023 01:00 PM before Judge Leon Schydlower,). Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower:Preliminary Hearing as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero held on 12/28/2023 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Detention Hearing as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero held on 12/28/2023 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero, Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero (Court Reporter ERO.) (mg2) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL GRANTING2 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. DETAIN WITHOUT BOND as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero (1). Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2) [3:23-mj-04213-LS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (bot2)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
14 14 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Gael Salvador Cortez-Caballero (bot2)
Related: [-]