Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00064
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2024
Terminated:Mar 06, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 19, 2024 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
LJ Ross Associates, Inc.
Represented By
R.J. Cronkhite
Cronkhite Counsel PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Ybarra
Represented By
John T Steinkamp
John Steinkamp & Associates LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 01, 2024
12 12 misc Satisfaction of Judgment - entered 11/1/03 or later Mon 04/01 3:25 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of Stephanie Ybarra Against LJ Ross Associates, Inc. by Stephanie Ybarra. (Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
11 11 misc Clerks Judgment Wed 03/06 4:26 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (dnj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
10 10 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Tue 03/05 10:05 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/05 10:05 AM
ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 3/22/2024. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2024 11:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 03/04/24. (slm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment Thu 02/29 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Stephanie Ybarra(Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Offer of Judgment
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/20 11:48 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LJ Ross Associates, Inc.. (Cronkhite, R.J.)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/20 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by R.J. Cronkhite on behalf of LJ Ross Associates, Inc. (Cronkhite, R.J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/15 11:17 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by LJ Ross Associates, Inc..(Cronkhite, R.J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/07 3:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Ybarra. LJ Ross Associates, Inc. served on 1/25/2024, answer due 2/15/2024.(Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service
Monday, January 22, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 01/22 9:20 AM
Summons Issued as to LJ Ross Associates, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 01/22 9:12 AM
***NEW CASE*** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/19 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John T Steinkamp on behalf of Stephanie Ybarra (Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/19 9:45 AM
COMPLAINT for Damages against LJ Ross Associates, Inc.( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5467104.), filed by Stephanie Ybarra.(Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Debt Collector License Information,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- The October 26, 2023 and October 30, 2023 letters sent to Defendant,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Plaintiff's Affidavit,
Att: 4 Exhibit A- Relevant pages of Plaintiff's December 27, 2023 Experian credit report,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons