California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:24-cv-00498
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2024
Terminated:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 19, 2024 1:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Hulu LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Liang
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Harper Siems Batts
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Christopher Scott Ponder
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Lai Lam Yip
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Piranha Media Distribution LLC
Represented By
Robert Francois Kramer
Kramer Alberti Lim And Tonkovich LLP
contact info
Russell S Tonkovich
Kramer Alberti Lim And Tonkovich LLP
contact info
Zachariah Allen Higgins
Kramer Alberti Lim And Tonkovich LLP
contact info
Curt Holbreich
Kramer Alberti Lim And Tonkovich LLP
contact info
Robert C. Mattson
Kramer Alberti Lim And Tonkovich LLC
contact info
Sal Lim
Kramer Alberti Lim And Tonkovich LLP
contact info
Charles S. Barquist
Maschoff Brennan
contact info
David L Alberti
Kramer Alberti Lim And Tonkovich LLP
contact info
Hong Syd Lin
Kramer Alberti Lim And Tonkovich LLP
contact info
Jeremiah A Armstrong
Kramer Alberti Lim And Tonkovich LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
55 55 appeal USCA Notification of Case Number Tue 10/08 3:56 PM
NOTIFICATION from Federal Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 2025-1038 assigned to Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals,54 as to Plaintiff Piranha Media Distribution LLC. (mat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
54 54 appeal Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals Tue 10/01 9:13 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Piranha Media Distribution LLC. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,50 , Judgment,53 . (Appeal Fee - $605 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38313746.) (Kramer, Robert)
Related: [-]