Oregon District Court
Judge:Adrienne Nelson
Case #: 3:24-cv-00126
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2024
Case in other court:California Central, 5:23-cv-01957
Last checked: Friday Jul 19, 2024 1:51 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Hotbox Farms LLC
Represented By
Benjamin P. Tarczy
Miller Nash LLP
contact info
Sean D. O'Brien
Miller Nash LLP
contact info
Delfina S. Homen
Miller Nash LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Puff Labs, LLC
Represented By
Kirstin Anna Jensvold-Rumage
Milord Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Jared M. Ahern
Cable Huston LLP
contact info
Milord A. Keshishian
Milord Law Group P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
TIW Holdings LLC
Represented By
Kirstin Anna Jensvold-Rumage
Milord Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Jared M. Ahern
Cable Huston LLP
contact info
Milord A. Keshishian
Milord Law Group P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Hotbox Farms LLC
Represented By
Benjamin P. Tarczy
Miller Nash LLP
contact info
Sean D. O'Brien
Miller Nash LLP
contact info
Benjamin Patrick Tarczy
Miller Nash LLP
contact info
Delfina S. Homen
Miller Nash LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Puff Labs, LLC
Represented By
Kirstin Anna Jensvold-Rumage
Milord Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Jonathan P Harlan
Cable Huston LLP
contact info
Milord A Keshishian
Milord Law Group P.C.
contact info
Jared M. Ahern
Cable Huston LLP
contact info
Milord A. Keshishian
Milord Law Group P.C.
contact info
Nicole A.W. Abercrombie
Cable Huston LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TIW Holdings LLC
Represented By
Kirstin Anna Jensvold-Rumage
Milord Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Jonathan P Harlan
Cable Huston LLP
contact info
Milord A Keshishian
Milord Law Group P.C.
contact info
Jared M. Ahern
Cable Huston LLP
contact info
Milord A. Keshishian
Milord Law Group P.C.
contact info
Nicole A.W. Abercrombie
Cable Huston LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 30 2024
OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims, ECF 44, is DENIED. Signed on 9/30/2024 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
GPO Apr 15 2025
OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff TIW Holdings LLC's Motion to Compel, ECF 58, is GRANTED. Signed on 4/15/2025 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
72 72 order Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Wed 04/16 10:09 AM
ORDER: The Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery and PTO Deadlines, ECF70 , is GRANTED. The Court adopts the following deadlines: the deadline to complete the depositions of Puff Labs LLC, TIW Holdings LLC, and Walker Wilkerson is May 30, 2025. The deadline to complete the depositions of Hotbox Farms, LLC, Steven Meland, and Tom Thompson is July 31, 2025. The deadline to complete discovery is extended to September 8, 2025. The deadline to exchange expert disclosures and reports is extended to October 10, 2025. The deadline to exchange rebuttal expert disclosures and reports is extended to November 14, 2025. The deadline to complete expert discovery is extended to December 18, 2025. The deadline to file dispositive motions is extended to January 30, 2026. Pretrial conference set for December 19, 2025, is extended to April 17, 2026 at 1:30PM-3:30PM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Adrienne Nelson. Six-day Jury Trial set for January 20, 2026 is continued to May 19, 2026 at 9:00AM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Adrienne Nelson. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
71 71 9 pgs order Opinion and Order Tue 04/15 3:49 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff TIW Holdings LLC's Motion to Compel, ECF58 , is GRANTED. Signed on 4/15/2025 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
70 70 motion Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Fri 04/11 9:59 AM
Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Puff Labs, LLC, TIW Holdings LLC. (Ahern, Jared)
Related: [-]