Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Taylor B Mcneel
Referred: Robert P Myers, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-00008
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2024
Terminated:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 16, 2024 3:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Christy Holifield
Represented By
Candice C. Hargett
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie - Oxford
contact info
Defendant
Wade Hosey
Represented By
Candice C. Hargett
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie - Oxford
contact info
Defendant
Jefferson Hughes
Represented By
Candice C. Hargett
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie - Oxford
contact info
Defendant
Debbie Smith
Represented By
Candice C. Hargett
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie - Oxford
contact info
Defendant
West Jasper School District
Represented By
Candice C. Hargett
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie - Oxford
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenitra Ezi
Represented By
Marcus A. Williams
Williams & Bass, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
60 60 order Judgment Tue 04/08 10:12 AM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. The parties agreed to and announced a resolution of this case. This case is dismissed with prejudice as to all parties. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 4/8/2025. (LDR)
Related: [-]