Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John E Steele
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:24-cv-00071
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2024
Terminated:Mar 28, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 19, 2024 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Immigrant Investor Program Office
Defendant
Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Office of the Chief Counsel 5900 Capital Gateway Drive Mail Stop 2120
Camp Springs, MD 20588
Plaintiff
Vanita Josephine Alice D Souza
Represented By
Gail Allison Hamaty-Bird
Hamaty Bird Law, P.A.
contact info
Dana Kristin Imperia
Green & Spiegel
contact info
Plaintiff
Chloe Marie Dominique D. Souza
Represented By
Gail Allison Hamaty-Bird
Hamaty Bird Law, P.A.
contact info
Dana Kristin Imperia
Green & Spiegel
contact info
Plaintiff
Kyle Anthony Rocky D. Souza
Represented By
Gail Allison Hamaty-Bird
Hamaty Bird Law, P.A.
contact info
Dana Kristin Imperia
Green & Spiegel
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 28, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 03/28 3:36 PM
ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/28/2024. (RKR)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Thu 03/28 2:50 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Vanita Josephine Alice D Souza, Chloe Marie Dominique D. Souza, Kyle Anthony Rocky D. Souza (Imperia, Dana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
12 12 service Summons returned executed Thu 02/22 12:13 PM
RETURN of service executed on 2/20/2024 by Vanita Josephine Alice D Souza, Chloe Marie Dominique D. Souza, Kyle Anthony Rocky D. Souza as to Immigrant Investor Program Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(Director), U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Imperia, Dana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Service of Summons
Monday, February 12, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 02/12 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Dana Kristin Imperia on behalf of Vanita Josephine Alice D Souza, Chloe Marie Dominique D. Souza, Kyle Anthony Rocky D. Souza. Lead Counsel: Dana Imperia. (Imperia, Dana)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/05 10:27 AM
ORDER granting 9 second motion for special admission of attorney Dana Imperia. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 2/5/2024. (TLP)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/02 4:08 PM
Second MOTION for Dan Kristin Imperia to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21730004 for $150 by Vanita Josephine Alice D Souza, Chloe Marie Dominique D. Souza, Kyle Anthony Rocky D. Souza.(Hamaty-Bird, Gail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Notice of Lead Counsel
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/24 11:43 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice 2 motion for special admission. Attorney Dana Imperia has not demonstrated that she is a member in good standing of the bar of a United States district court in accordance with Local Rule 2.01(c)(2). The motion also fails to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g), which the court tends to strictly enforce. Lastly, to ensure compliance with Local Rule 2.01(c), attorneys seeking special admission must use the template motion available on the court's website at flmd.uscourts.gov/form/motion-special-admission as set forth in the civil action order (Doc. 7 at 3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/24/2024. (TLP)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Civil Action Order Wed 01/24 11:30 AM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/24/2024. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
6 6 service Summons issued Mon 01/22 4:44 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Immigrant Investor Program Office. (EAM)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 01/22 4:38 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Dana Kristin Imperia, Gail Allison Hamaty-Bird of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EAM)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons issued Summons issued as to USA Mon 01/22 4:31 PM
SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(Director), U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (EAM)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/22 11:22 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:24-cv-71-JES-NPM. Motion(s) REFERRED:2 First MOTION for Dana Kristin Imperia to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21678228 for $150 . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (ARC)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/19 5:09 PM
First MOTION for Dana Kristin Imperia to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21678228 for $150 by Alice D Souza, Chloe D Souza, Kyle D Souza.(Hamaty-Bird, Gail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Supplement Consent to File Local Counsel
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/19 5:05 PM
COMPLAINT Mandamus against Alissa Emmel, Ur M. Jaddou, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21678188) filed by Alice D Souza, Chloe D Souza, Kyle D Souza.(Hamaty-Bird, Gail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Receipt Notices USCIS,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Jaddou,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons USCIS,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Emmel,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Jaddou c/o Garland,
Att: 7 Proposed Summons Jaddou c/o Handberg