Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Anthony E Porcelli
Case #: 8:24-cv-00182
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2024
Terminated:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 19, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Jill E. Mcdowell
Represented By
Danielle Tamara Gauer
Wilson Elser
contact info
Mediator
Hillary High
5712 River Reserve Court
Tampa, FL 33619
Plaintiff
Robert Forgione
Represented By
Michael J. Vitoria
Morgan & Morgan
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
27 27 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 12/04 4:32 PM
TEXT ORDER. The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation and Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. 25 ). The Court construes the parties' filing solely as a stipulation of dismissal. The Stipulation is self-executing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC , 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and motions and close the file. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 12/4/2024. (BPC)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 12/04 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 12/03 3:47 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) by Jill E. Mcdowell. (Gauer, Danielle)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order Dismissing Case Tue 12/03 9:22 AM
TEXT ORDER. Defendant has filed a Notice of Settlement. (Doc. 23 ). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice subject to the right of any party within sixty days to file another paper per Local Rule 3.09(b) or to move to reopen the case, which motion the Court would liberally grant. If no such papers have been filed within this sixty-day period, the dismissal of this case shall be with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is now DIRECTED to deny all pending motions as moot, terminate any deadlines, and close the case, subject to reopening if the parties file an appropriate motion within the sixty-day deadline set forth above. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 12/3/2024. (BPC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of settlement Tue 11/26 1:59 PM
NOTICE of settlement 22 by Jill E. Mcdowell (Gauer, Danielle)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order Tue 11/26 9:57 AM
TEXT ORDER. The mediator has reported a settlement. (Doc. 21 ). No later than 12/04/2024, the parties are DIRECTED to file a notice of settlement in accordance with Local Rule 3.09(a). Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 11/26/2024. (BPC)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
21 21 adr Mediation report Fri 11/22 2:31 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on. (Kantor, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Tue 10/29 4:05 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on November 21, 2024 at 1:00 PM before Adam Kantor. (Vitoria, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/14 1:35 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jill E. Mcdowell.(HAI)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Wed 08/14 10:46 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Motion to Amend. The Clerk is directed to file Defendant's Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses on the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/14/2024. (KBP)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
17 17 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Fri 08/09 1:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend4 Answer to Complaint by Jill E. Mcdowell.(Gauer, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Thursday, February 29, 2024
16 16 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 02/29 4:01 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 4/22/2024; Discovery due by 2/1/2025; Dispositive motions due by 3/3/2025; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/31/2024; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 12/31/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2025 at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 9 B before Judge John L. Badalamenti. Trial set for term commencing 8/4/2025 before Judge John L. Badalamenti. The parties anticipate a jury trial will take 5 days to complete. Conduct mediation hearing by 3/19/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 2/29/2024. (JS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
15 15 misc Case Management Report Tue 02/27 9:22 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Vitoria, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
14 14 service Proof of service Tue 01/30 2:15 PM
PROOF of service by Robert Forgione (Vitoria, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Civil Action Order Tue 01/30 1:16 PM
CIVIL Action Order. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 1/30/2024. (SRC)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/30 12:36 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Robert Forgione. (Vitoria, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 01/30 12:23 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Robert Forgione. Related case(s): No (Vitoria, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/25 10:20 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Jill E. Mcdowell. (Gauer, Danielle)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 01/25 10:19 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jill E. Mcdowell. Related case(s): No (Gauer, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 01/24 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael J. Vitoria on behalf of Robert Forgione. Lead Counsel: Michael J. Vitoria. (Vitoria, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 01/24 4:17 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 01/24 4:17 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 01/24 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Danielle Tamara Gauer on behalf of Jill E. Mcdowell. Lead Counsel: Danielle T. Gauer. (Gauer, Danielle)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/24 12:16 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jill E. Mcdowell.(Gauer, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 01/23 10:15 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael J. Vitoria and Danielle Tamara Gauer of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AET)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/19 4:30 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:24-cv-00182-JLB-AEP. (TRF)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 01/19 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Pasco County Florida, case number 2023-CA-004727 filed in State Court on 11/07/2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21677521 filed by JILL E MCDOWELL.(Gauer, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet