Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Case #: 8:24-cv-00184
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2024
Terminated:May 02, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 19, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
ECP Gopher Holdings, LP
Represented By
Robert C. Collins, III
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Mark S. Mester
Latham & Watkins, LLP
contact info
Joseph H. Varner, III
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Brian S. Goldenberg
Holland & Knight
contact info
Defendant
Gopher Holdings, LLC
Defendant
Advanced Technology Services, Inc.
Represented By
Kristen Wagner Durant
contact info
Defendant
Gopher Resource, LLC
Represented By
Brian Trujillo
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ian M. Ross
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
T.F.
Represented By
Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
contact info
Michael Jay Fuller, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
39 39 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 02/27 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
38 38 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 02/26 5:39 PM
ENDORSED ORDER of DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) and upon review of 37 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/26/2025. (AC)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Wed 02/26 11:18 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by T.F. (Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
36 36 order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 07/31 4:19 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 35 Status Update and Motion to Extend Stay. In light of certain of the Parties' having reached an agreement in principle to settle this case and the status of related state court actions, this action is hereby STAYED for a period of two hundred and ten (210) days. On or before February 26, 2025, the Parties shall inform the Court of the status of this case and of the Parties' intent to continue litigation. The Clerk is directed to STAY and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/31/2024. (AC)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Stay Wed 07/31 9:03 AM
MOTION to Extend Stay and Status Update by T.F. (Fuller, Michael) Modified on 7/31/2024 as to docket text (ARL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
34 34 order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 05/02 6:05 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 33 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay All Deadlines in light of their having reached an agreement in principle to settle this case and other related state court actions. This action is hereby STAYED for a period of ninety (90) days. On or before July 31, 2024, the Parties shall inform the Court of the status of this case and of the Parties' intent to continue litigation. The Clerk is directed to STAY and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/2/2024. (AC)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Stay Thu 05/02 9:01 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 04/04 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Ian M. Ross on behalf of Gopher Resource, LLC. Lead Counsel: Ian M. Ross. (Ross, Ian)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 04/04 1:14 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Brian Trujillo and Ian M. Ross of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/04 11:18 AM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 29 Defendant Gopher Resource, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant Gopher Resource, LLC, shall file an answer or other response to the Complaint on or before May 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/4/2024. (AC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 04/03 6:28 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Gopher Resource, LLC. (Ross, Ian)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/03 3:30 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 21 Defendant ECP Gopher Holdings, LP's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to File Its Corporate Disclosure Statement. Defendant ECP Gopher Holdings, LP, shall file an answer or other response to the Complaint on or before May 3, 2024. Likewise, Defendant ECP Gopher Holdings, LP, shall file the required disclosure statements on or before May 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/3/2024. (AC)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of appearance Wed 04/03 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian S. Goldenberg on behalf of ECP Gopher Holdings, LP (Goldenberg, Brian)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/03 2:25 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robert C. Collins III may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit their Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 4/3/2024. (CES)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/03 2:23 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Mark S. Mester may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit their Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 4/3/2024. (CES)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/03 1:36 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Robert C. Collins III to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21940749 for $150 by ECP Gopher Holdings, LP. (Varner, Joseph)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/03 1:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Mark S. Mester to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21940726 for $150 by ECP Gopher Holdings, LP. (Varner, Joseph)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 04/03 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Joseph H. Varner, III on behalf of ECP Gopher Holdings, LP. Lead Counsel: Joseph H. Varner, III. (Varner, Joseph)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 04/03 1:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint and to File Its Corporate Disclosure Statement by ECP Gopher Holdings, LP. (Varner, Joseph)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Proof of service Wed 04/03 10:24 AM
PROOF of service by T.F. (Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Proof of service Wed 04/03 10:20 AM
PROOF of service by T.F. (Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Proof of service Wed 04/03 10:17 AM
PROOF of service by T.F. (Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/02 10:09 AM
NOTICE of filing Certificate of Good Standing by T.F. re 16 Order(Fuller, Michael) Modified on 4/2/2024 to edit docket text (EAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, April 01, 2024
16 16 order Order Mon 04/01 3:52 PM
ENDORSED ORDER DIRECTING that, on or before April 15, 2024 Counsel Michael Jay Fuller, Jr. shall provide proof of membership in or special admission to the Middle District Bar permitting him to practice in the Middle District pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/1/2024. (AC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of appearance Thu 03/21 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Trujillo on behalf of Gopher Resource, LLC (Trujillo, Brian)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of appearance Thu 03/21 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ian M. Ross on behalf of Gopher Resource, LLC (Ross, Ian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of appearance Thu 03/07 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Wagner Durant on behalf of Advanced Technology Services, Inc. (Durant, Kristen)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/07 1:32 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by T.F.. (Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 03/07 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael Jay Fuller, Jr on behalf of T.F.. Lead Counsel: Michael J Fuller Jr. (Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Proof of service Thu 03/07 10:58 AM
PROOF of service by T.F. (Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 01/23 2:10 PM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 01/23 10:38 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael Jay Fuller, Jr. of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 01/23 10:38 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael Jay Fuller, Jr. of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
6 6 service Summons issued Mon 01/22 3:16 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Gopher Resource, LLC. (BGR)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons issued Mon 01/22 3:16 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Gopher Holdings, LLC. (BGR)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons issued Mon 01/22 3:15 PM
SUMMONS issued as to ECP Gopher Holdings, LP. (BGR)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Mon 01/22 3:14 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Advanced Technology Services, Inc. (BGR)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/22 1:25 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-00184-MSS-AAS. (TRF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/19 5:26 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21678266) filed by T. F., a Minor, by and through His Parent and Natural Guardian TIMOTHY FLAGLER.(Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh D,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh E,
Att: 7 Proposed Summons Summons-ATS,
Att: 8 Proposed Summons Summons-ECP Gopher Holdings LP,
Att: 9 Proposed Summons Summons-Gopher Holdings LLC,
Att: 10 Proposed Summons Summons-Gopher Resource LLC