New Jersey District Court
Judge:Renee Marie Bumb
Referred: Sharon A King
Case #: 1:24-cv-00330
Nature of Suit835 Property Rights - Patent – Abbreviated New Drug Application
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2024
Terminated:Jul 29, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 19, 2024 4:48 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
RIO BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By
ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Saiber LLC
contact info
KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Saiber LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Represented By
CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
ALEXANDER LEE CALLO
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
WILLIAM C. BATON
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
Represented By
CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
ALEXANDER LEE CALLO
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
WILLIAM C. BATON
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Defendant
RIO BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By
ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Saiber LLC
contact info
KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Saiber LLC
contact info
Notice Only
PHV STEPHEN R. AUTEN
COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR Taft, Stettinius & Hollister LLP 111 East Wacker Drive Suite 2600
CHICAGO, IL 60601
Notice Only
PHV PHILIP Y. KOUYOUMDJIAN
COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR Taft, Stettinius & Hollister LLP 111 East Wacker Drive Suite 2600
CHICAGO, IL 60601
Notice Only
PHV JAIMIN H. SHAH
COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR Taft, Stettinius & Hollister LLP 111 East Wacker Drive Suite 2600
CHICAGO, IL 60601
Plaintiff
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Represented By
CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
ALEXANDER LEE CALLO
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
WILLIAM C. BATON
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NOVO NORDISK INC.
Represented By
CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
ALEXANDER LEE CALLO
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
WILLIAM C. BATON
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 29, 2024
36 36 3 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 07/29 1:49 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/29/2024. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
35 35 misc Letter Fri 07/26 4:25 PM
Letter from Plaintiffs to the Hon. Renee Marie Bumb, U.S.D.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
34 34 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Thu 06/27 11:37 AM
Stipulated Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 6/26/2024. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
33 33 misc Letter Tue 06/25 4:54 PM
Letter from Plaintiffs to the Hon. Sharon A. King, U.S.M.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order Tue 06/11 10:23 AM
LETTER ORDER, Granting an extension of time; the proposed confidentiality order is now due 6/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 6/10/2024. (js)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Letter Mon 06/10 4:00 PM
Letter from Plaintiffs to the Hon. Sharon A. King, U.S.M.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
30 30 misc Transcript Mon 06/10 9:49 AM
Transcript of Initial Scheduling Conference held on 5/28/2024, before Judge King. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diana Doman Transcribing, LLC (856-435-7172). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 6/28/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/8/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2024. (js)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 05/30 11:37 AM
Set Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 6/27/2025 per29 Scheduling Order. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
29 29 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/29 3:51 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/28/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/29/2024. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
28 28 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 05/28 3:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 5/28/2024. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Recorded) (js)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
27 27 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 05/21 7:49 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC..(LIZZA, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
26 26 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 05/20 4:46 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC..(LIZZA, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, May 03, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 05/03 10:51 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document25 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/20/2024. (jab)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
25 25 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 04/29 2:09 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' time to answer, move, or otherwise reply to Rio Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Answer, Separate Defenses, and Counterclaims to Complaint for Patent Infringement (ECF No. 19).. (CALLO, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
24 24 order Order Mon 04/22 11:40 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having received the April 19, 2024 letters, in Case No. 24-330 [ECF No. 23] and Case No. 24-688 [ECF No. 19] filed by Sarah A. Sullivan, Esquire, counsel for Plaintiff Novo Nordisk Inc.; it is hereby ORDERED that the May 14, 2024 initial scheduling conference in Case No. 24-330 shall be RESCHEDULED to May 28, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. The initial scheduling conference in Case No. 24-688 shall also be held on the same date and time. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID: 605 365 669#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 4/22/24. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
23 23 misc Letter Fri 04/19 8:39 PM
Letter from Plaintiffs to the Hon. Sharon A. King, U.S.M.J.. (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
22 22 order Order Wed 04/17 10:24 AM
TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on May 14, 2024 at 10:00 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-856-210-8988 Conference ID 605 365 669# Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 4/17/24. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
21 21 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Tue 04/16 9:58 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 5/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 4/16/2024. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
20 20 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 04/15 7:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by RIO BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 04/15 7:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , Separate Defenses, and , COUNTERCLAIM against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. by RIO BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
18 18 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 03/28 2:02 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to defendant Rio Biopharmaceuticals, Inc...(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 03/28 3:40 PM
CLERK'S TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer - Document18 submitted by RIO BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC. on 3/28/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/15/2024. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 03/27 9:05 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jaimin H. Shah, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15217016.) (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 03/27 9:02 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Philip Y. Kouyoumdjian, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15217008.) (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 03/27 9:00 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stephen R. Auten, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15216994.) (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Wed 03/27 12:03 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEPHEN R. AUTEN, PHILIP Y. KOUYOUMDJIAN and JAIMIN H. SHAH, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/25 9:25 AM
ORDER Granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jaimin H. Shah, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 3/22/2024. (mag)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/25 9:23 AM
ORDER Granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Philip Y. Kouyoumdjian, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 3/22/2024. (mag)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/25 9:19 AM
ORDER Granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen R. Auten, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 3/22/2024. (mag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/19 8:57 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen R. Auten, Esq., Philip Y. Kouyoumdjian, Esq., and Jaimin H. Shah, Esq. (Unopposed) . Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/18 6:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen R. Auten, Esq., Philip Y. Kouyoumdjian, Esq., and Jaimin H. Shah, Esq. (Unopposed) by RIO BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Arnold B. Calmann, Esq.,
Att: 2 Declaration of Stephen R. Auten, Esq.,
Att: 3 Declaration of Philip Y. Kouyoumdjian, Esq.,
Att: 4 Declaration of Jaimin H. Shah, Esq.,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/18 6:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of RIO BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/18 6:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD B. CALMANN on behalf of RIO BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 02/07 12:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK A/S. RIO BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC. waiver sent on 2/1/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
7 7 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Thu 01/25 9:03 AM
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (jab)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 01/25 9:00 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to RIO BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Thu 01/25 8:59 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jab)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/23 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER LEE CALLO on behalf of NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. (CALLO, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/23 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/23 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. (BATON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 01/19 4:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/19 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT against RIO BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15023153) , Related Case Selected , filed by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK A/S.(LIZZA, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 01/22 2:07 PM
Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw)
Related: [-]