New York Western District Court
Case #: 1:24-cv-00071
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2024
Terminated:Jan 22, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 19, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Brueggers Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By
Marshall T. Potashner
Jaffe & Asher
contact info
Plaintiff
Buckingham Properties, LLC
259 Alexander Street
Rochester, NY 14607
Plaintiff
Monroe Clover Plaza, LLC


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, January 22, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/22 1:02 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Unassigned. Case opened in Buffalo in error and transferred to Rochester under case number 24-cv-6044. All future docketing shall be entered on the Rochester case. (TMK)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/19 2:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.. (Potashner, Marshall)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 01/19 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Monroe, case number E20233014699. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5085002), filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Potashner, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summon,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Exhibit A to Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Exhibit B to Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Exhibit C to Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Exhibit D to Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Exhibit E to Complaint,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Exhibit F to Complaint,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Exhibit G to Complaint,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Stipulation,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Docket Index,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet