HINNANT v. OLD VINEYARD BEHAVIORAL HEALTH CENTER
North Carolina Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas D Schroeder |
Referred: | Joe L Webster |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00045 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 04, 2024 4:25 AM EST |
Defendant
OLD VINEYARD BEHAVIORAL HEALTH CENTER
|
|
Plaintiff
CARLA HINNANT
1701 FOUNTAIN DR. NE APT L
WILSON, NC 27893 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/19 8:58 AM
Set Deadlines: Objections to R&R due by 5/3/2024. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 5/6/2024. (cc) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Mailing Recommendation
Thu 04/18 3:35 PM
Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 5/2/2024. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 5/5/2024. (cc) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/18 11:20 AM
ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 04/18/2024, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entry of this Order. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Complaint be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cc) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Application to Proceed IFP
Thu 04/18 11:21 AM
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 04/18/2024, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entry of this Order. (cc) |
||
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 01/19 3:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sh) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/19 3:14 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against OLD VINEYARD BEHAVIORAL HEALTH CENTER filed by CARLA HINNANT. (sh) |
|
Att: 1 EDNC documents, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope - Front and Back | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed IFP
Fri 01/19 3:13 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by CARLA HINNANT. (sh) |
|
utility
Case Assigned
Fri 01/19 3:47 PM
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (sh) |
||
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 01/19 3:55 PM
Motion Referred: RE:1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (sh) |