New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Ramon E Reyes, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-00364
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, October 14, 2024
17 17 misc Affidavit/Affirmation Wed 10/16 4:11 PM
"REPLY AFFIDAVIT" filed by Jatiek Smith. (ENE)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Affidavit/Affirmation Wed 10/16 4:09 PM
"REPLY AFFIDAVIT" filed by Mickyle Angevin Smith. (ENE)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice(Other) Wed 10/16 4:07 PM
Memorandum of Law Supporting Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Per 28 USC 2241 filed by Jatiek Smith. (ENE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 08/15 4:55 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Petitioner's reply is due 10/14/2024. No further extensions will be granted. Ordered by Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 8/15/2024. (AH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
14 14 misc Letter Thu 08/15 4:34 PM
Letter dated 8/6/2024 to Judge Reyes from Pro Se Petitioner Jatiek Smith regarding not getting an update from court. See letter for further details. (ENE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 08/14 10:12 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Jatiek Smith. (ENE)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Mail Returned Tue 08/13 10:19 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Copy of 07/23/2024 Electronic Order. Mail sent to Jatiek Smith, 08188-510, MDC Brooklyn, 100 29th Brooklyn, NY 11232. Postal Notification: Return to Sender. Refused. Unable to Forward. (JP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
order Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 07/23 4:45 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Petitioner's letter11 seeking an additional 45-day extension from 7/25/2024 to reply to the Government's opposition. Petitioner's reply is now due by 9/9/2024. Ordered by Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/23/2024. (MV)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 21, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Tue 07/23 3:38 PM
Letter dated 7/9/2024 to Judge Reyes from Pro Se Petitioner Jatiek Smith requesting an extension for current extension of Adjournment of 45 days. See letter for further details. (ENE)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 06/10 1:02 PM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Petitioner's letter10 seeking a 45-day extension to reply to the Government's opposition. Petitioner's reply is now due by 7/25/2024. Ordered by Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 6/10/2024. (AH)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
10 10 misc Letter Fri 06/07 9:31 AM
Letter dated 4/20/2024 to Judge Reyes from Pro se Petitioner Jatiek Smith requesting an Adjournment for 45 days. See letter for further details. (ENE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
9 9 misc Declaration Wed 05/08 3:04 PM
DECLARATION re8 Response to Order to Show Cause, Declaration,7 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Service on Petitioner by MDC Brooklyn Warden (Balaban, Rachel)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Declaration Wed 05/08 2:27 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by MDC Brooklyn Warden, DECLARATION re7 Memorandum in Opposition by MDC Brooklyn Warden (Balaban, Rachel)
Related: [-]
7 7 13 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Wed 05/08 2:23 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and in Response to Order to Show Cause filed by MDC Brooklyn Warden. (Balaban, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
order Order(Other) Thu 04/25 10:43 AM
ORDER: Petitioner requests the Court to direct MDC Brooklyn to allow access to the law library, regardless of any lockdown6 , but the Court is without authority to issue such an order. Should Petitioner need more time to reply due to lack of library access, the Court will entertain a motion seeking an extension of time. Ordered by Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 4/25/2024. (AH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
6 6 misc Letter Wed 04/24 11:30 AM
Letter dated 4/20/2024 to Judge Reyes from Pro Se Defendant Jatiek Smith requesting an order from the court directing MDC Brooklyn to allow Utilize of the Law liberty regardless of any lock down. See letter for further details. (ENE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
5 5 misc Letter Wed 04/03 9:43 AM
Letter dated 4/1/2024 to Judge Reyes from Pro Se Petitioner Jatiek Smith requesting the court to deny the Governments request for 45- day extension. See letter for further details. (ENE)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 03/22 12:08 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Petition. Accordingly: (1) the Government shall serve a copy of his or return on Petitioner and file the original thereof, with proof of service by May 9, 2024 ; (2) Petitioner shall file his reply, if any, with proof of service, with the Clerk of this Court by June 9, 2024 . Ordered by District Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 3/22/2024. (AH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 03/21 12:48 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Return to the Petition by MDC Brooklyn Warden. (Balaban, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause (Federal) Thu 01/25 4:07 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon the petition for issuance of a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241, dated January 19, 2024; it is ORDERED that: (1) The United States Attorney, as attorney for respondent, shall show cause before this Court why a writ of habeas corpus should not be issued by the filing of a return to the petition on or before March 25, 2024; (2) The United States Attorney shall serve a copy of his or her return on Petitioner and shall file the original thereof, with proof of such service with the Clerk of this Court; (3) On or before April 24, 2024, Petitioner shall file a reply, if any, with proof of service, with the Clerk of this Court; (4) Service of a copy of this Order together with a copy of the petition shall be made by the Clerk of this Court via electronic case filing, to the United States Attorney and by mailing a copy of this Order to Petitioner. (5) The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the petition upon Petitioners current custodian, the Metropolitan Detention Center. Show Cause Response due by 3/25/2024. Ordered by District Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/25/2024. (ENE)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/19 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT against MDC Brooklyn Warden, filed by Jatiek Smith. (CV)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Thursday, January 18, 2024
2 2 misc Filing Fee Received Fri 01/19 3:58 PM
FILING FEE: $ 5.00, receipt number 100012103 (CV)
Related: [-]