Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Michael L Brown
Referred: Regina D Cannon
Case #: 1:24-cv-00235
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2024
Terminated:May 15, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 15, 2024 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Jefferson Capital Systems LLC
Represented By
Kirsten H. Smith
Sessions, Israel & Shartle LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eugene Curtis, III
6422 Valerie Bluff
Lithonia, GA 30058


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/04 8:47 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Jefferson Capital Systems LLC. (Smith, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/15 11:40 AM
ORDER. The parties have announced that this case has settled. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The parties shall file a dismissal or other filing disposing of this case upon finalization of the settlement. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 15th day of May, 2024. c:Financial Office(pdt)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 05/15 11:43 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (pdt)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/15 11:44 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eugene Curtis, III re10 Order. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 05/14 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Pending by Jefferson Capital Systems LLC (Smith, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
8 8 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/20 2:29 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Amendments to the pleadings submitted LATER THAN 30 DAYS after the date of this Order will not be accepted without opposing party consent or good cause shown. The discovery deadline is 6/24/2024. Any motions for summary judgment must be filed by 7/24/2024, and if no motions for summary judgment are filed, the proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due on that date. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-submit this action to the undersigned by 7/26/2024 if the parties have neither moved for summary judgment nor filed a proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 2/20/2024. (jbu)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 02/20 2:31 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eugene Curtis, III re8 Scheduling Order. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
7 7 discov Initial Disclosures Fri 02/16 5:10 PM
Initial Disclosures by Jefferson Capital Systems LLC.(Smith, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A - Witness List,
Att: 2 Attachment C - Discoverable Data,
Att: 3 Attachment E - JCAP's Insurance Information
6 6 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 02/16 5:08 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Jefferson Capital Systems LLC. (Smith, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
5 5 order Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Thu 01/25 1:12 PM
Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 1/25/2024. (kng)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Notice to Pro Se Parties Thu 01/25 1:01 PM
NOTICE to Pro Se Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 1/25/2024. (kng)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/25 1:16 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eugene Curtis, III re4 Notice to Pro Se Parties,5 Order-Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. (kng)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/24 10:33 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jefferson Capital Systems LLC. (Smith, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 01/24 10:31 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Affirmative Defenses by Jefferson Capital Systems LLC. Discovery ends on 6/24/2024.(Smith, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 01/19 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by Jefferson Capital Systems LLC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13163245)(adg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet