Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Claude M Hilton
Referred: Lindsey R Vaala
Case #: 1:24-cv-00062
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2024
Terminated:May 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 6:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Michael Braggs
Plaintiff
Susie Cordon
P.O. Box 6714
Alexandria, VA 22306


Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Friday, May 03, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/03 10:54 AM
ORDERED that this case is dismissed pursuant to F.R.Civ.P.4 (m). Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 5/3/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/12 7:28 PM
ORDERED that the Plaintiff within twenty (20) days show cause, if any they can, why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 4(m) due to Plaintiff not providing a proper address for the named Defendant to allow the United States Marshal Service to perform service. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 4/12/2024. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Mon 02/26 4:24 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Michael Braggs. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 01/25 11:24 AM
Summons Issued and given to USMS for service of process as to Michael Braggs (Dest)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 285 US Marshals Service Form
Monday, January 22, 2024
4 4 order Sealed Order Mon 01/22 8:54 PM
Under Seal ORDER granting2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/22/2024. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 01/19 6:28 PM
Proposed Summons in re1 Complaint, filed by Susie Cordon. (Dest)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/19 6:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Susie Cordon. (Dest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/19 6:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Michael Braggs, filed by Susie Cordon. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope