Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Stanley A Bastian
Case #: 4:21-cv-05156
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3730 False Claims Act - Civil Actions
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jan 21, 2024 12:20 AM PST
Defendant
Centerra Group LLC
Defendant
Hanford Mission Integration Services LLC
Defendant
Jacobs Engineering Group Inc
Defendant
Leidos Inc
Defendant
Leidos Integrated Technology LLC
Defendant
Lockheed Martin Corporation
Defendant
Mission Support Alliance LLC
Defendant
Parsons Government Services Inc
Defendant
Wackenhut Services Inc
Plaintiff
Bradley D Keever
Represented By
Meredith Ann Crafton
Smith & Lowney PLLC
contact info
Eric Knoll Lowney
Smith & Lowney PLLC
contact info
Nikolas F Peterson
Hanford Challenge
contact info
Plaintiff
The United States of America
ex rel by Bradley D Keever U.S. Attorney's Office 920 W. Riverside, Suite 300
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
Tyler Howard Louis Tornabene
U S Attorney'S Office - Spo
contact info
Daniel Hugo Fruchter
U S Attorney'S Office - Spo
contact info
Frieda K Zimmerman
U S Attorney'S Office - Ric
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 20, 2025
37 37 7 pgs order Order Thu 02/20 4:40 PM
AMENDED JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER; granting36 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2026 at 10:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 203. Jury Trial set for 2/23/2026 at 09:00 AM in Richland Courtroom 189. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (WMK, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
36 36 motion Amend/Correct Wed 02/05 10:58 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2025 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Zimmerman, Frieda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/14 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn J Kinn on behalf of Bradley D Keever (Attorney Katelyn J Kinn added to party Bradley D Keever(pty:pla))(Kinn, Katelyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
34 34 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 05/15 12:50 PM
JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 5/16/2024 is STRICKEN. Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2025 at 11:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 203. Jury Trial set for 9/22/2025 at 09:00 AM in Richland Courtroom 189, commencing with a Final Pretrial Conference at 08:30 AM . Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (WMK, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
33 33 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/15 9:03 AM
ORDER DISMISSING DECLINED CLAIMS without prejudice; re32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (WMK, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 12, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Case Sun 05/12 10:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Bradley D Keever(Crafton, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, May 09, 2024
31 31 misc Joint Certificate - Rule 26 / Rule 16 Thu 05/09 2:10 PM
Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 by The United States of America. (Smith, Molly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
30 30 notice Scheduling Conference Notice Thu 04/04 3:15 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 5/16/2024 at 11:00 AM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
29 29 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/28 12:17 PM
TEXT ORDER; Defendant, Hanford Mission Integration Solutions, LLC, Motions for Permission to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF Nos.26 and27 , are GRANTED. Shawn M. Wright and Luke W. Meier are hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case for Defendant, Hanford Mission Integration Solutions, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Defendant's local counsel of record, J. Chad Mitchell, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (BM, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/26 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance Molly M.S. Smith by Molly Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Molly Smith added to party Bradley D Keever(pty:pla), Attorney Molly Smith added to party The United States of America(pty:pla))(Smith, Molly)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
27 27 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/25 4:16 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Luke W. Meier. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4511814. by Hanford Mission Integration Services LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian.(Mitchell, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
26 26 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/25 4:10 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Shawn M. Wright. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4511795. by Hanford Mission Integration Services LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian.(Mitchell, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
25 25 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/25 4:00 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hanford Mission Integration Services LLC. (Mitchell, J)
Related: [-]
24 24 answer Answer to Intervenor Complaint Mon 03/25 3:58 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Hanford Mission Integration Services LLC.(Attorney J Chad Mitchell added to party Hanford Mission Integration Services LLC (pty:dft))(Mitchell, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
23 23 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/22 2:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Hanford Mission Integration Services LLC. (Zimmerman, Frieda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
22 22 misc Amended/Corrected Document - NOT Complaint Wed 01/24 5:03 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by The United States of America Re21 Intervenor Complaint. Description: Remove duplicated Complaint pages. (Zimmerman, Frieda)
Related: [-]
21 21 cmp Intervenor Complaint Wed 01/24 4:15 PM
Intervenor COMPLAINT Bradley D. Keever Filed by The United States of America.(Zimmerman, Frieda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Ex Parte Motion Fri 01/19 8:58 AM
ORDER GRANTING19 PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES' UNOPPOSED EX PARTE MOTION TO UNSEAL. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
19 19 EX PARTE MOTION, Applicable Party The United States of America, by The United States of America.(TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
18 18 ORDER RE: UNITED STATES' NOTICE TO INTERVENE IN PART; granting17 United States' Notice of Election to Intervene in Part and to Decline to Intervene in Part. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
17 17 UNITED STATES' NOTICE OF ELECTION TO INTERVENE IN PART AND TO DECLINE TO INTERVENE IN PART by The United States of America.(TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 05, 2023
16 16 ORDER GRANTING14 PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES' UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR PARTIAL LIFT OF SEAL. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
15 15 Ex Parte Document filed by The United States of America. (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
14 14 United States' Unopposed Application for Partial Lifting of the Seal by The United States of America.(TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
13 13 ORDER GRANTING11 APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CONSIDER ELECTION ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TNC, Case Administrator) (Main Document 13 replaced on 8/25/2023L to affix file stamp) (TNC, Case Administrator).
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
12 12 Ex Parte Document filed by The United States of America. (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
11 11 UNITED STATES' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO CONSIDER ELECTION TO INTERVENE.(TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 27, 2023
10 10 ORDER GRANTING8 APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CONSIDER ELECTION. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
9 9 Ex Parte Document filed by The United States of America. (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
8 8 UNITED STATES' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO CONSIDER ELECTION TO INTERVENE.(TNC, Case Administrator) Modified on 8/11/2023: to correct grammar in docket text (TNC, Case Administrator).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 12, 2022
7 7 ORDER GRANTING5 APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CONSIDER ELECTION. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LAS, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
6 6 Ex Parte Document by United States of America. Applicable Party United States of America. (CLP, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
5 5 EX PARTE MOTION, Applicable Party United States of America; by United States of America.(CLP, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 14, 2022
4 4 Ex Parte ORDER. Applicable Party: USA. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
3 3 Ex Parte Document by United States of America. Applicable Party United States of America. (CLP, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
2 2 EX PARTE MOTION, Applicable Party United States of America, by United States of America.(CLP, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $402, Receipt # 26UB8V0D) Jury Demand. Filed by Bradley D Keever.(CLP, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet 2