New Jersey District Court
Judge:William J Martini
Referred: Mark Falk
Case #: 2:14-cv-07134
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2014
Terminated:May 28, 2015
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 8:10 PM EDT
Defendant
MARK A. BALIC
Represented By
ARTHUR L. PORTER, JR.
Fischer, Porter & Thomas PC
contact info
AARON E. ALBERT
Fischer Porter & Thomas, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
MBC INSULATION, INC.
Represented By
ARTHUR L. PORTER, JR.
Fischer, Porter & Thomas PC
contact info
AARON E. ALBERT
Fischer Porter & Thomas, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
TIM N. NASSERI
Represented By
ARTHUR L. PORTER, JR.
Fischer, Porter & Thomas PC
contact info
AARON E. ALBERT
Fischer Porter & Thomas, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ATLANTECH DISTRIBUTION, INC.
Represented By
LIAM Y. BRABER
Jacoby Donner, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, August 14, 2015
21 21 motion Withdraw Fri 08/14 2:51 PM
MOTION to Withdraw19 MOTION to Reopen Case by ATLANTECH DISTRIBUTION, INC.. (BRABER, LIAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2015
20 20 order Order Thu 08/06 9:55 AM
TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for August 13, 2015 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Plaintiff's counsel shall arrange for and initiate the conference call. Please mark your calendars accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 8/6/15. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2015
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/28 8:20 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to19 MOTION to Reopen Case . Motion set for 9/8/2015 before Judge William J. Martini. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2015
19 19 motion Reopen Case Mon 07/27 2:54 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by ATLANTECH DISTRIBUTION, INC..(BRABER, LIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NOTICE OF MOTION,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Certification,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit A
Thursday, May 28, 2015
18 18 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/28 12:46 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 5/28/15. (gh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2015
17 17 misc Letter Tue 05/12 1:39 PM
Letter from Aaron E. Albert re16 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,. (ALBERT, AARON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2015
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/07 11:46 AM
ORDER, ( In Chambers Conference set for 5/14/2015 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk.) In addition to and wholly separate from counsel, defendant isrequired to attend the conference in person and be present and available all day. Plaintiff shall be available by telephone and be available the entire day. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/7/15. (DD, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 05/07 3:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Telephone Conference held on 5/7/2015. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 28, 2015
15 15 order Order Tue 04/28 12:32 PM
TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that the telephone conference before the Undersigned on 4/28/2015 is hereby rescheduled to May 7, 2015 at 10:15 a.m. Defendants' counsel shall arrange for and initiate the conference call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 4/28/15. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2015
14 14 order Order Mon 04/13 3:18 PM
TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that the telephone conference before the Undersigned on 4/17/2015 is hereby rescheduled to April 28, 2015 at 10:15 a.m. Defendants' counsel shall arrange for and initiate the conference call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 4/13/15. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2015
13 13 misc Letter Fri 04/10 5:04 PM
Letter from Aaron E. Albert re 12 Order,. (ALBERT, AARON)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2015
12 12 order Order Fri 03/27 3:26 PM
TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for April 17, 2015 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Defendants' counsel shall arrange for and initiate the conference call. Please mark your calendars accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 3/27/2015.(LM, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2015
11 11 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/12 11:26 AM
ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2015., Fact Discovery due by 7/31/2015., Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2015., Telephone/Status Conference set for 3/26/2015 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk.); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 3/11/15. (DD, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2015
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 03/05 9:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Scheduling Conference held on 3/4/2015. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 03, 2015
10 10 order Order Tue 02/03 1:48 PM
TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that the in-person scheduling conference before the Undersigned on 2/11/2015 is hereby rescheduled to March 4, 2015 at 11:30 a.m. The same requirements stated in the Court's prior order apply. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 2/3/2015.(LM, )
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter Tue 02/03 12:04 PM
Letter from Arthur "Scott" L. Porter, Jr. re8 Order, Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags. (PORTER, ARTHUR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 20, 2015
8 8 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 01/20 4:53 PM
LETTER ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2015 at 10:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 1/20/15. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 10, 2014
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/10 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ARTHUR L. PORTER, JR on behalf of MARK A. BALIC, MBC INSULATION, INC., TIM N. NASSERI (PORTER, ARTHUR)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/10 11:16 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARK A. BALIC, MBC INSULATION, INC., TIM N. NASSERI. (ALBERT, AARON)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/10 11:14 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by MARK A. BALIC, MBC INSULATION, INC., TIM N. NASSERI.(ALBERT, AARON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 26, 2014
4 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by ATLANTECH DISTRIBUTION, INC.. All Defendants. (BRABER, LIAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 14, 2014
3 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARK A. BALIC, MBC INSULATION, INC., TIM N. NASSERI Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Dianne C. Richards* (dr, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint assigned Civil No. 14-7134 WJM) submitted on 11/13/2014 by LIAM Y. BRABER, ESQ. appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (dr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 13, 2014
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATLANTECH DISTRIBUTION, INC. identifying HERITAGE ENCON GROUP, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (dr, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against MARK A. BALIC, MBC INSULATION, INC., TIM N. NASSERI ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 6047978), filed by ATLANTECH DISTRIBUTION, INC..(dr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exh A to Cmp,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet