Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:23-mj-02097
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2023
Terminated:Dec 22, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jan 21, 2024 1:21 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
David Collins Cox (1)
Terminated: 12/22/2023
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Houston
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/21/2024 1:39 AM CST
Friday, December 22, 2023
Arrest (Rule 32) of David Collins Cox, filed. (GeorgeKelner, 4)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to David Collins Cox: Initial Appearance - Rule 32 set for 12/22/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8B before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison (GeorgeKelner, 4)
Related: [-]
Arrest of David Collins Cox, filed. (RubenCastro, 3)
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 12/22/2023 before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison as to David Collins Cox. Defendant first appearance on Supervised Release Violation from the Texas Western District Court 5:16-cr-00741-XR-1 and advised of rights/charges. Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial affidavit executed, Defendant appeared with counsel. Order appointing FPD for limited purpose, Waiver of executed on the record, Defendant ordered removed to originating district. Rule 5(f) order orally given. Rule 5(f) written order to be entered. Parties orally consented to appear by video on the record. Defendant waives detention hearing here in this district, expressly reserving the right to seek a detention hearing in the charging district Appearances: AUSA Shelley Sullivan for USA; AFPD Heather Hughes for Defendant.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) Defendant remanded to custody, filed. (RubenCastro, 3)
Related: [-]
RULE 5 Papers sent via email to Texas Western District Court San Antonio Division as to David Collins Cox, filed.(RubenCastro, 3)
Related: [-]
1 1 Petition for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision from Western District of TX, San Antonio Division as to David Collins Cox, filed.(GeorgeKelner, 4)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant issued 4/12/2021; Returned Executed on 12/22/2023 as to David Collins Cox. Defendant was arrested in Houston, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (GeorgeKelner, 4)
Related: [-]
3 3 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by David Collins Cox, filed.
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER FOR LIMITED PURPOSE. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (RubenCastro, 3)
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to David Collins Cox. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (RubenCastro, 3)
Related: [-]
6 6 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to David Collins Cox. Defendant committed to the Texas Western District Court. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (RubenCastro, 3)
Related: [-]