Intergrated Construction Management, Inc. v. Wolverine Fire Protection, Co., et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Carlos E Mendoza |
Referred: | Robert M Norway |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00137 |
Nature of Suit | 130 Contract - Miller Act |
Cause | 28:1352 Miller Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 19, 2024 4:36 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Great American Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Wolverine Fire Protection, Co.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
The United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wolverine Fire Protection, Co.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Terrance M. White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Belen Valda
101 E. Arlington Street
Satellite Beach, FL 32937 |
|
Third Party Defendant
Geraldo Valda
101 E. Arlington Street
Satellite Beach, FL 32937 |
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Great American Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Great American Insurance Company
Terminated: 06/21/2024
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
David C Spatta
Terminated: 06/21/2024
17905 Gourd Neck Loop
Winter Garden, FL 34787 |
|
Third Party Defendant
Heather Spatta
Terminated: 06/21/2024
17905 Gourd Neck Loop
Winter Garden, FL 34787 |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, March 28, 2025 | ||
41 | 41
transfer
Division transfer out
Fri 03/28 4:44 PM
TRANSFER to Jacksonville Division and assigned case number 3:25-cv-341-MMH-LLL. (RPB) |
|
40 | 40
![]() ORDER granting 14 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer Case. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division for all further proceedings and to close this file. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/28/2025. (MEH) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 07/31 4:01 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot the 32 Motion to Dismiss in light of the 38 Order dismissing those claims. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/31/2024. (KMD) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
![]() ORDER- It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the claims Integrated Construction Management, Inc. brought against Great American Insurance Company, and the claims Great American Insurance Company brought against Integrated Construction Management, Inc., David C. Spatta, and Heather Spatta are DISMISSED with prejudice subject to the right of any party, within sixty days from the date of this Order, upon good cause, to move the Court to re-open the case as to those parties in accordance with Local Rule 3.09(b). The Clerk is directed to terminate Great American Insurance Company as Defendant, Counter Claimant, and Third Party Plaintiff in this matter; and terminate David C. Spatta and Heather Spatta as Third Party Defendants in this matter. Thereafter, the Clerk is directed to amend the case style accordingly. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/21/2024. (MEH) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by Great American Insurance Company. (Divers, Brett) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
![]() NOTICE of settlement by Great American Insurance Company (Divers, Brett) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 05/28 11:00 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Reply. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/28/2024. (JW) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Request for Leave to Reply to Wolverine's DE 31 by The United States of America. (Kinberg, Edward) |
|
33 | 33
![]() Third-Party SUMMONS issued as to David C Spatta, Heather Spatta, Belen Valda, Geraldo Valda. (AJS) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() MOTION to Dismiss Great American Insurance Company's Counterclaim [DE 21] by The United States of America.(Kinberg, Edward) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Wolverine's Counterclaim filed by Wolverine Fire Protection, Co.. (Tucker, John) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/10/2024 Joinder of Parties due by 7/10/2024 Discovery due by 8/29/2025 Dispositive motions due by 9/30/2025 Pretrial statement due by 2/2/2026 All other motions due by 2/2/2026 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 7/1/2025 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/31/2025 Trial Status Conference set for 2/19/2026 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza Jury Trial set for March 2026 trial term in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/12/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/9/2024. (MEH) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION to Strike15 Answer to Complaint Counterclaim filed by Wolverine Fire Protection, Co.. (Tucker, John) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply
Wed 05/01 9:02 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply. Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to the Counterclaim on or before May 16, 2024. Future extension motions in this case shall be filed more than three business days before the expiring deadline and must demonstrate the movant's diligence in meeting the deadline in addition to good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 5/1/2024. (JBS) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by The United States of America(f/u/b Intergrated Construction Managment, Inc., a Florida corporation). (Kinberg, Edward) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Kinberg, Edward) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Wolverine's Counterclaim by The United States of America(f/u/b Intergrated Construction Managment, Inc., a Florida corporation). (Kinberg, Edward) |
|
24 | 24
![]() MOTION to Strike15 Answer to Complaint Counterclaim by The United States of America(f/u/b Intergrated Construction Managment, Inc., a Florida corporation). (Kinberg, Edward) |
|
23 | 23
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division filed by The United States of America(f/u/b Intergrated Construction Managment, Inc., a Florida corporation).(Kinberg, Edward) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Great American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Inc. for Great American Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company. (Divers, Brett) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Great American Insurance Co.'s ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against The United States of America, Belen Valda, Heather Spatta, Geraldo Valda, David C Spatta, COUNTERCLAIM against The United States of America, Belen Valda, Heather Spatta, Geraldo Valda, David C Spatta by Great American Insurance Company.(Divers, Brett) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/05 8:31 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Defendant's counterclaim on or before April 22, 2024. No further extensions of this deadline will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 4/5/2024. (JBS) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re12 Counterclaim,15 Answer to Complaint Counterclaim by The United States of America(f/u/b Intergrated Construction Managment, Inc., a Florida corporation). (Kinberg, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. Modified on 4/4/2024 to edit docket text (JDR) |
|
18 | 18
![]() JOINDER in motion by Great American Insurance Company re14 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division filed by Wolverine Fire Protection, Co. . (Divers, Brett) |
|
Sunday, March 24, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Sun 03/24 1:55 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Great American Insurance Company's 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for good cause shown. Defendant Great American Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before April 10, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 3/24/2024. (Norway, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Great American Insurance Company. (Divers, Brett) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against The United States of America by Wolverine Fire Protection, Co..(Tucker, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division by Wolverine Fire Protection, Co..(Tucker, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
13 | 13
![]() CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wolverine Fire Protection, Co. identifying Corporate Parent Bunkhouse Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Cork Associates, LLC for Wolverine Fire Protection, Co... (Tucker, John) |
|
12 | 12
![]() COUNTERCLAIM (and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to 1 Complaint) against The United States of America filed by Wolverine Fire Protection, Co..(Tucker, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() PROOF of service by The United States of America (Kinberg, Edward) |
|
10 | 10
![]() PROOF of service by The United States of America (Kinberg, Edward) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Wed 01/24 8:49 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida is currently operating in a Judicial Emergency due to a judicial vacancy and the number of cases in the division. Accordingly, civil cases, and especially newly filed civil cases, will be the Court's lowest priority unless emergency issues are presented. Counsel and the parties are encouraged to consider consenting to the Magistrate Judge for the entire case or disposition of any dispositive motions in order to have their case considered on a more timely basis. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/24/2024. (MEH) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order
Wed 01/24 8:48 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/24/2024. (MEH) |
|
7 | 7
![]() INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/24/2024. (MEH) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (LD) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 01/23 10:33 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Edward J. Kinberg, Blake Bernard Stewart of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 01/22 3:47 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-00137-CEM-RMN. (JG) |
|
Saturday, January 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Intergrated Construction Management, Inc., a Florida Corporation. (Kinberg, Edward) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Intergrated Construction Management, Inc., a Florida Corporation. Related case(s): No (Kinberg, Edward) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21678567) filed by Intergrated Construction Management, Inc., a Florida Corporation.(Kinberg, Edward) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |