Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:24-cv-00066
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 8:59 AM CDT
Defendant
Greenstar Power LLC
Represented By
Benjamin David Williams
Watstein Terepka LLP
contact info
Bradley A. Monk
Hilgers Graben PLLC
contact info
Defendant
John Doe Lead Generator Identified as Zen Energy
Represented By
Bradley A. Monk
Hilgers Graben PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly Pinn
Represented By
Andrew Roman Perrong
Perrong Law LLC
contact info
Anthony I. Paronich
Paronich Law, P.C.
contact info
Leland Garrett McRae
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, November 07, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 11/07 4:21 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
23 23 service Summons Issued Tue 08/27 3:45 PM
Summons Issued as to BRND BLDRS, LLC, Jared Bolduc. (dm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Parties Tue 08/27 3:09 PM
ORDER; IT IS ORDERED that Greenstar Power is TERMINATED as a party in this case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
Related: [-]
21 21 16 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/27 3:04 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against BRND BLDRS, LLC, Jared Bolduc amending1 Complaint filed by Kelly Pinn.(dm)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 08/26 3:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kelly Pinn.(Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Summons - BRND
order Order on Motion to Amend Complaint Mon 08/26 2:48 PM
Text Order GRANTING18 Motion to Amend Complaint entered by Judge Robert Pitman. For good cause shown, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiff's amended complaint, (Dkt. 18-1). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
19 19 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 08/19 3:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Greenstar Power LLC by Kelly Pinn. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
18 18 motion Amend Complaint Wed 08/07 7:09 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint by Kelly Pinn.(Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint
utility Notice of Correction Thu 08/08 2:44 PM
Notice of Correction to Andrew Roman Perrong: Re:18 Motion to Amend Complaint. This filing contains the case style for the First Amended Complaint and not the Complaint filed on 01/22/2024. Please note for future reference that the motion must be filed with the style in the original complaint and if the court grants the motion, the new style may be filed in all future pleadings. No further action is required at this time. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/05 4:58 PM
ORDER for Parties to file dismissal papers or a joint status report on settlement discussions by 08/19/2024. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
16 16 1 pgs notice Notice of Settlement Tue 06/04 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Kelly Pinn (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 05/28 4:15 PM
ORDER Setting Initial Pretrial Conference for 6/3/2024 03:30 PM before Judge Dustin M. Howell. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 05/22 9:06 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin David Williams on behalf of Greenstar Power LLC. Attorney Benjamin David Williams added to party Greenstar Power LLC(pty:dft) (Williams, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
13 13 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 05/17 5:23 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Greenstar Power LLC, John Doe Lead Generator Identified as Zen Energy. (Monk, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Fri 05/03 3:51 PM
Order for Proposed Scheduling Order. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/17/2024. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
11 11 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Wed 04/17 4:36 AM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Kelly Pinn. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/29 1:04 PM
Defendant Greenstar Power LLC's ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Bradley A. Monk added to party Greenstar Power LLC(pty:dft) by Greenstar Power LLC.(Monk, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
9 9 3 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/09 7:02 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Pinn. Greenstar Power LLC served on 2/8/2024, answer due 2/29/2024. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 02/05 2:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Greenstar Power LLC. (dm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/02 2:40 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kelly Pinn. (Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
utility Notice of Correction Fri 01/26 10:22 AM
Notice of Correction: re4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony I. Paronich ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18326748). *Docket entry reflects Motion to Appear Pro Hace Vice, however pdf is a Notice of Dismissal for a case in the Northern District of Illinois. Motion has been terminated. Please refile Notice of Dismissal in proper case. (dm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/25 2:16 PM
ORDER GRANTING3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anthony Paronich. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/22 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Roman Perrong on behalf of Kelly Pinn (Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/22 10:29 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony I. Paronich ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18326748) by on behalf of Kelly Pinn. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/22 9:08 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony I. Paronich ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18326087) by on behalf of Kelly Pinn. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/22 7:44 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leland Garrett McRae on behalf of Kelly Pinn (McRae, Leland)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/22 7:13 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18325737), filed by Kelly Pinn.(McRae, Leland)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/22 2:12 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Mon 01/22 2:12 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 01/22 2:13 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kelly Pinn. (kp)
Related: [-]