Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Jane M Beckering
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:24-cv-00051
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Terminated:Feb 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 5:21 AM EDT
defendant
Darren Erb
Represented By
Edward P. Perdue
Perdue Law Group PLLC
contact info
plaintiff
Intracity Dispatch, Inc.
Represented By
Julianna Marie Hyatt-Wierzbicki
Smith Haughey Rice & Roegge Pc (muskegon)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
7 7 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 02/07 3:23 PM
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice by defendant Darren Erb (Perdue, Edward)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Wed 02/07 3:18 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by defendant Darren Erb (Perdue, Edward)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Stipulation Wed 02/07 11:33 AM
STIPULATION Dismissal with Prejudice by plaintiff Intracity Dispatch, Inc. (Hyatt-Wierzbicki, Julianna)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/29 8:44 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Tue 01/23 3:13 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering (eod)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
2 2 service Proof of Service Mon 01/22 11:04 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Darren Erb for Notice of Removal and Filing in State Court (Perdue, Edward)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 01/22 10:25 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 14th Circuit Court case number 23-005820-CB filed by Darren Erb (Perdue, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Darren Erb,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - State Notice of Filing of Removal
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Mon 01/22 10:40 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by defendant Darren Erb in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7272261 (Perdue, Edward)
Related: [-]