Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan
Referred: Giselle Lopez-Soler
Case #: 3:24-cv-01030
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Terminated:Sep 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 5:34 AM AST
Defendant
A, B, and C Corporations
Defendant
Amber McLeod
3535 Lebon Drive, #4420
San Diego, CA 92122
Defendant
Tyrone Ross
3535 Lebon Drive, #4420
San Diego, CA 92122
Defendant
Turnqey Labs, Inc.
3535 Lebon Drive, #4420
San Diego, CA 92122
Defendant
X, Y, Z Insurance Companies
Plaintiff
Manoj Ghayalod
7000 Bahia Beach Blvd
Rio Grande, PR 00745
Represented By
Jose J. Lamas-Rivera
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
35 35 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 04/30 3:20 PM
ORDER granting34 Motion for extension of time. Informative motion regarding settlement discussion due by May 20, 2025 . Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 4/30/2025. (PGA)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/30 2:45 PM
Consent MOTION for extension of time until May 20, 2025 to conclude discussion related to pending post-settlement issues filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Amber McLeod, Tyrone Ross, Turnqey Labs, Inc.. Responses due by 5/14/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
33 33 minutes Minute Status Conference Wed 04/16 4:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler: Status Conference held on 4/14/2025. The parties will meet and confer within the next ten (10) days to discuss Defendants' request. A joint informative motion is due by April 30, 2025 , informing the Court whether they were able to reach an agreement on the satisfaction of their settlement commitments or whether they need additional time to complete negotiations. If no agreement is feasible, the Court will set an argumentative hearing to discuss the matters at Docket Nos. 21, 25, and 28. (PGA)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
32 32 order ~Util - Set Hearings Order Fri 03/21 4:23 PM
ORDER re21 MOTION to Enforce Judgment. Status Conference set for 4/14/2025 at 9:30 a.m. in GLS's Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 3/21/2025. (PGA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
31 31 order Order Referring Motion Mon 03/17 10:49 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE GISELLE LOPEZ-SOLER FOR DISPOSITION:21 " Motion to Enforce Judgment" filed by Manoj Parbatsingh Ghayalod Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 3/17/2025. (ao)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
30 30 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 03/06 12:50 PM
ORDER granting:29 "Motion for Leave to File Document." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 3/6/2025. (ao)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Leave to File Document Thu 03/06 12:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Surreply to Docket No. 28 filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Amber McLeod, Tyrone Ross, Turnqey Labs, Inc.. Responses due by 3/20/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Tendered Surreply,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Tendered Surreply
Monday, March 03, 2025
28 28 respm Reply to Motion Mon 03/03 2:59 PM
REPLY to Motion filed by Manoj Parbatsingh Ghayalod Re:26 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Enforcement of Settlement Agreement filed by Manoj Parbatsingh Ghayalod filed by Manoj Parbatsingh Ghayalod.(Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 02/26 9:48 AM
ORDER granting:26 "Motion for Leave to File Document." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 2/26/2025. (ao)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Leave to File Document Wed 02/26 9:09 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Enforcement of Settlement Agreement filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Manoj Parbatsingh Ghayalod. Responses due by 3/12/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
25 25 6 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Fri 02/21 4:32 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to the Motion to Enforce Judgment filed by Amber McLeod, Tyrone Ross, Turnqey Labs, Inc. Re:21 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Manoj Parbatsingh Ghayalod filed by Amber McLeod, Tyrone Ross, Turnqey Labs, Inc..(Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
24 24 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 02/05 1:36 PM
ORDER granting:23 "Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to ECF No.21 ." Response due by 2/21/2025. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 2/5/2025. (ao)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time Wed 02/05 10:35 AM
MOTION for extension of time until February 21, 2025 to oppose Docket No. 21 filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Amber McLeod, Tyrone Ross, Turnqey Labs, Inc.. Responses due by 2/19/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Demand Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Letter regarding Breaches
Thursday, January 30, 2025
22 22 order Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment Thu 01/30 10:44 AM
ORDER holding in abeyance:21 "Motion to Enforce Judgment." Defendant shall respond to plaintiff's request by 2/6/2025. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 1/30/2025. (ao)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
21 21 motion Enforce Judgment Tue 01/28 4:15 PM
MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Manoj Parbatsingh Ghayalod. Responses due by 2/11/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
20 20 order Judgment Thu 09/19 1:26 PM
JUDGMENT is entered DISMISSING this action WITH PREJUDICE in its entirety. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 9/19/2024. (ao)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Settlement Agreement - Attorney Only Thu 09/19 11:31 AM
**CASE PARTICIPANTS**SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Manoj Ghayalod. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
18 18 order Order Wed 09/18 9:29 AM
ORDER granting:15 "Notice of Voluntary Dismissal." Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 9/18/2024. (ao)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion requesting Order Wed 09/18 8:46 AM
ORDER granting:16 "Motion Requesting Permission to Submit Confidential Settlement Agreement." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 9/18/2024. (ao)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
16 16 motion Requesting Order Tue 09/17 7:25 PM
MOTION requesting Order requesting permission to submit Confidential Settlement Agreement filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Manoj Ghayalod. Responses due by 10/1/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Attorney Only Tue 09/17 7:18 PM
Joint NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Manoj Ghayalod (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
14 14 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 09/12 2:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan: Status Conference held on 9/11/2024. Present were counsel Jose Lamas-Rivera on behalf of plaintiff and counsel Mauricio Muniz on behalf of defendants. The parties informed that a settlement agreement was reached and is just a matter of finalizing settlement documents. The agreement reached is binding upon the parties. Dismissal papers due on or before by 9/18/2024. By the same date, if the parties wish the court to retain jurisdiction for enforcement purposes, they shall file their confidential settlement agreement under the "selected parties category". (Court Reporter N/A.) (Hearing held in HR Courtroom 2.) (mr)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/11 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Amber McLeod, Tyrone Ross, Turnqey Labs, Inc. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
12 12 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 09/03 1:02 PM
ORDER. In light of the parties' failure to file their dismissal papers by 8/26/2024, a Status Conference is set for 9/11/2024 at 1:30 PM in Hato Rey Courtroom 2 before Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 9/3/2024.(ao)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 08/19 8:36 AM
ORDER granting:10 "Motion for Extension of Time." Dismissal papers due by 8/26/2024. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 8/19/2024. (ao)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time Fri 08/16 5:18 PM
MOTION for extension of time filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Manoj Ghayalod. Responses due by 8/30/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
9 9 order Order on Informative Motion Mon 07/29 9:09 AM
ORDER noting:8 "Informative Motion." Dismissal papers due by 8/16/2024. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 7/29/2024. (ao)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
8 8 motion Informative Motion Fri 07/26 2:48 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Settlement Agreement and Requesting Fourteen-day-period to File Voluntary Dismissal and Confidential Settlement Agreement filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Manoj Ghayalod. Responses due by 8/9/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 06/25 8:21 AM
ORDER granting:6 "Motion for Extension of Time." Responsive pleading due by 7/24/2024. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 6/25/2024. (ao)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time Mon 06/24 3:48 PM
Joint MOTION for extension of time to to file responsive pleading to the complaint filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Manoj Ghayalod. Responses due by 7/8/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
5 5 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 04/18 5:54 PM
ORDER granting:4 "Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Summons Pursuant to FRCP 4(m)" filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Manoj Ghayalod. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 4/18/2024. (ao)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time Thu 04/18 11:59 AM
MOTION for extension of time to for service of summons pursuant to FRCP 4(m) filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Manoj Ghayalod Responses due by 5/2/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/23 9:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Amber McLeod, Tyrone Ross, Turnqey Labs, Inc. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vrg)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 01/23 9:02 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. (vrg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/22 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT against Manoj Ghayalod ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-8523034.), filed by Manoj Ghayalod. Service due by 4/22/2024,(Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Category Sheet Category Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Summons Tyron Ross,
Att: 4 Summons Summons Amber,
Att: 5 Summons Turnqey Labs