Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Joseph F Saporito, Jr
Referred: Sa
Case #: 1:24-cv-00108
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
26 26 misc Request (Do not use if you are filing a motion or requesting default; see default events below) Tue 05/06 12:01 PM
REQUEST for Review of Pending Motions and Reassertion of Innocense filed by Alterik Banks. (aaa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
25 25 misc Letter Tue 02/04 9:57 AM
Letter to Court from Alterik Banks re case. (aaa)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
24 24 misc Letter Fri 12/20 10:49 AM
Letter to Court from Alterik Banks re case. (aaa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
23 23 motion Expedite Wed 11/13 10:18 AM
MOTION for Expedited Release by Alterik Banks.(aaa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
22 22 misc Reply (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Thu 11/07 10:34 AM
REPLY to Respondent's Rule 5 Submission filed by Alterik Banks.(aaa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) pgs 1-50,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) pgs 51-100,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) pgs 101-166
Thursday, October 31, 2024
21 21 misc Reply (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Thu 10/31 9:31 AM
REPLY to Respondent's Response filed by Alterik Banks. (aaa)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
20 20 159 pgs misc Supplement Fri 10/25 1:26 PM
Supplement by Mark Steven Matthews. Respondents' Supplemental Response . (Matthews, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 10/24 11:59 AM
ORDER denying18 Motion for immediate release and expedited resolution. Respondent shall supplement its response by filing all documents required by Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases within 14 days of date of this order. Any reply due by petitioner 14 days after they are filed.See Order for complete details. Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 10/24/24 (ms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/22 10:12 AM
MOTION for Immediate Release and Expedited Resolution filed by Alterik Banks.(aaa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
17 17 misc Letter Thu 10/10 10:57 AM
Letter to Court from Alterik Banks re case. (aaa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Tue 09/17 9:37 AM
Letter to Court from Alterik Banks re case. (aaa)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
order Verbal Order Reassigning Case Fri 08/30 2:53 PM
VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr for all further proceedings. (jw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
15 15 misc Letter Thu 08/29 9:59 AM
Letter to Court from Alterik Banks re case. (aaa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
14 14 misc Letter Thu 07/18 11:06 AM
Letter from Alterik Banks to Judge Rambo re case. (ibr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
order Verbal Order Referring Case to Pro Se Law Clerk Mon 07/15 10:32 AM
VERBAL ORDER REFERRING CASE TO PRO SE LAW CLERK Pro Se Law Clerk SA. (jw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
13 13 misc Mail Returned Fri 05/31 10:49 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order9 dated 4/24/2024 sent to Susan Affronti returned, envelope marked "RTS, Unable to Forward". Forwarding address unknown. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
12 12 respoth Statement of Facts Mon 05/20 10:26 AM
STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by Alterik Banks. (sh)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Traverse Mon 05/20 10:25 AM
TRAVERSE filed by Alterik Banks to10 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus.(sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 County Transcripts,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s)
Monday, May 13, 2024
10 10 8 pgs misc Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus Mon 05/13 10:28 AM
RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Mark Steven Matthews by Mark Steven Matthews. (Matthews, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
9 9 service Show Cause Order & Petition for H/C Served Wed 04/24 8:51 AM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER and petn and Served on Respondent, PA AG, DA Monroe County by 1st class mail. (ma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/23 10:10 AM
ORDER: 1. The Clerk of Court is directed to SERVE a copy of the petn1 and this Order on Resps Warden of Monroe County Correctional Facility, the AG of PA, and the DA of Monroe County. 2. Within (20) days of the date of this Order, Resps shall respond to the allegations of the petn. 3. Petr shall, if he so desires, file a reply to Resps pleading within (14) days after its filing. 4. A determination as to whether or not Petr shall be produced for a hearing will be held in abeyance pending the filing of Resps pleading. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 4/23/24. (ma)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Election Wed 03/13 2:13 PM
NOTICE OF ELECTION filed by Alterik Banks re6 Administrative Order with Notice of Limitations of Filing 2254 Petition. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
6 6 order Administrative Order With Notice of Limitations of Filing 2254 Petition Wed 03/06 12:40 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER with Notice of Limitations on Filing of Future Petitions Under 28 U.S.C. Section 2254. Notice of election attached. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 3/6/24. (ma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
5 5 misc Letter Tue 02/27 1:57 PM
Letter from Plaintiff (ma)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
utility ADI Receipt Entry Wed 01/24 10:23 AM
Receipt of payment from ALTERIK BANKS in the amount of $5.00 for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Transaction posted on 1/23/2024. Receipt number 333108135 processed by AO. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
4 4 misc Filing Fee Received - Petition is now deemed Filed Tue 01/23 4:58 PM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 333108135. Petition is now deemed FILED. (ao)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order - 30 Day Administrative Order Mon 01/22 1:55 PM
THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 01/22/2024.(lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP (habeas corpus)
2 2 misc Pro Se Letter Issued - DJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Mon 01/22 1:47 PM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (lp) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/22/2024) (lp). (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/22/2024) (lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed) Mon 01/22 1:43 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Alterik Banks.(lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copies of Emails from petitioner to Ofc. Angelmyer and excerpts from unidentified transcripts