Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mia Roberts Perez
Case #: 2:24-cv-00293
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant
SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC.
Represented By
JOHN R. MARTIN
Pillar Aught LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER MILTON
Represented By
DAVID M. KOLLER
Koller Law PC
contact info

GPO Apr 24 2025
MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 4/24/25. 4/24/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
GPO Apr 24 2025
ORDER THAT THE 12 MOTION IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 4/24/25. 4/24/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
18 18 misc Bill of Costs Fri 05/02 3:01 PM
BILL OF COSTS by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC.. (MARTIN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Thu 04/24 2:54 PM
ORDER THAT THE12 MOTION IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 4/24/25. 4/24/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
16 16 6 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Thu 04/24 2:51 PM
MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 4/24/25. 4/24/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/07 6:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHRISTOPHER MILTON.(KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, February 21, 2025
14 14 13 pgs respm Memorandum Fri 02/21 1:18 PM
Memorandum re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC.. (MARTIN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Statement Fri 02/21 1:17 PM
Statement of Facts (Joint) by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC..(MARTIN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Pl. Dep. Tr.,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Ross Dep. Tr.,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Employee Assignments Offered,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Policy Acknowledgements,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Jeanes Dep. Tr.,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Incident Report (Sept. 27, 2021),
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Written Discipline (Toro),
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Written Discipline (Plaintiff),
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Email re- CCA for Alyssa & Kaleya,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Incident Report (Sept. 30, 2021),
Att: 11 Exhibit K - HR Investigation Notes (Sept. 27 to Oct. 1, 2021),
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Security Officer Handbook (excerpt),
Att: 13 Exhibit M - Email re- Recommendations,
Att: 14 Exhibit 1 & 2 - Plaintiff's Exhibits to Statement of Facts
12 12 motion Summary Judgment Fri 02/21 1:07 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC..Certificate of Service.(MARTIN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/03 3:01 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. NO. 10) IS GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 2/7/2025. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 2/21/2025. RESPONSES DUE BY 3/7/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 12/3/2024. 12/3/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 12/03 12:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and all other deadlines filed by CHRISTOPHER MILTON.Certificate of Service.(KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, September 09, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Mon 09/09 3:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 6/4/2025 AT 4:00 PM IN Courtroom 6A BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ. ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 12/9/2024. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 1/10/2025. MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 5/19/2025. THE PARTIES PRETRIAL MEMOS ARE DUE BY 6/2/2025. THIS MATTER IS IN THE JURY TRIAL POOL BEGINNING ON 6/23/2025 AND ENDING ON 7/3/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 9/9/2024. 9/9/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
8 8 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 09/09 3:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ.Pretrial Conference held on 9/9/2024. (ahf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
7 7 misc Report Of Thu 08/29 5:29 AM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Conference by CHRISTOPHER MILTON. (KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 07/26 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Hearing:RULE 16 CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/9/2024 02:30 PM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ. 7/26/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED (Mountney, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
5 5 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 05/10 2:54 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Securitas Security Services, Inc. with Certificate of Service by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC..(MARTIN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/10 2:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC..(MARTIN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Wed 05/01 10:19 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by B&R re: served Complaint upon Russell Goodwin / Securitas by Personal Service - Hand Delivery on April 19, 2024 (KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 01/23 10:22 AM
Summons Issued as to SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/23/24. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 01/22 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT against SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17206290.), filed by CHRISTOPHER MILTON.(KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form