California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:24-cv-00144
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court, 30-02023-01364367
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 2:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
McLaren Automotive, Inc.
Represented By
Michael T. Lee
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Daniel R Villegas
Lehrman Villegas Chinery And Douglas LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Aftin Andraos
Represented By
Theodore Richard Tang
The Law Offices Of Robert L Starr Apc
contact info
Robert L Starr
Law Office Of Robert Starr Apc
contact info
Adam Morris Rose
Law Office Of Robert Starr Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
16 16 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 12/18 4:05 PM
ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION.The Stipulation to Dismiss Case15 filed on December 18, 2024 is hereby GRANTED. All pending dates in this matter are vacated. The Clerk shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
15 15 stip Dismiss Case Wed 12/18 2:03 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to settlement filed by plaintiff Aftin Andraos.(Rose, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
14 14 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 06/03 2:37 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
13 13 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Fri 05/31 4:12 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#24-078) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee. This case is transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:24-cv-00144 RGK(DFMx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Thu 03/28 9:39 AM
ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 03/28 9:38 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 9/5/2024. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 11/4/2024. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 9/19/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2025 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 1/14/2025 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
10 10 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 03/07 2:59 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Aftin Andraos.. (Rose, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 01/25 9:39 AM
NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on March 28, 2024. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 01/24 4:29 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 01/24 4:28 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 01/24 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
5 5 trial Jury Demand Tue 01/23 2:36 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Aftin Andraos.. (Rose, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
4 4 trial Jury Demand Mon 01/22 7:24 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant MCLAREN AUTOMOTIVE, INC.. (Villegas, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 01/22 7:19 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant MCLAREN AUTOMOTIVE, INC, identifying McLaren Group. (Villegas, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 01/22 6:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant MCLAREN AUTOMOTIVE, INC. (Villegas, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 01/22 6:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2023 01364367-CU-BC-NJC Receipt No: ACACDC-36768417 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant MCLAREN AUTOMOTIVE, INC. (Attorney Daniel R Villegas added to party MCLAREN AUTOMOTIVE, INC(pty:dft))(Villegas, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Daniel R. Villegas,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 01/24 4:43 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, McLaren Automotive, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Aftin Andraos. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/29/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 01/24 4:46 PM
NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant McLaren Automotive, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
Related: [-]