New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert E Grossman
Case #: 8:24-bk-70271
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Feb 21, 2024
Dismissed:Feb 27, 2024
Terminated:Mar 15, 2024

Debtor
Artistic Design 123 Inc
56B Gardiners Ave
Levittown, NY 11756-3705
Represented By
Artistic Design 123 Inc
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Marc A. Pergament
Marc A. Pergament, Trustee 400 Garden City Plaza Ste 309
Garden City, NY 11530
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 01/23/2024 12:05 AM EST
Monday, January 22, 2024
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto Mon 01/22 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $338.00. Receipt Number 80270459. (DG) (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 01/22 12:01 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $ 338 Filed by Artistic Design 123 Inc (hrm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign) Mon 01/22 12:02 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Business Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee, Pergament, Marc A., with 341(a) Meeting to be held on 2/21/2024 at 03:00 PM at Zoom.us/join - Pergament: Meeting ID 626 617 2846, Passcode 3244273243, Phone 1 (516)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Deficient Filing Chapter 7 Mon 01/22 12:04 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 7:Mailing Matrix / List of Creditors Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-3 due by 1/22/2024. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 1/22/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 1/22/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 1/22/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 2/5/2024. Schedule A/B due 2/5/2024. Schedule D due 2/5/2024. Schedule E/F due 2/5/2024. Schedule G due 2/5/2024. Schedule H due 2/5/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 2/5/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 2/5/2024. (hrm)
Related: [-]