Maryland District Court
Judge:Lydia Kay Griggsby
Case #: 8:24-cv-00120
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2024
Case in other court:Florida Middle, 6:23-cv-01073
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 5:43 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Barton Malow Company
Counter Claimant
CM Glazing LLC
Counter Claimant
RTM Engineering Consultants, LLC
a foreign corporation 7901 4th Street North Suite 300
St. Petersburg, FL 33702
Represented By
Thomas Kincaid McCraw, Jr
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Jonathan Nehmer + Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Scott Shannon
Lee/shoemaker, PLLC
contact info
Annica Mae Mattus
Lee/shoemaker PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Barton Malow Company
Counter Defendant
Rosemont Hotels, Inc.
a Florida corporation 3001 Sherberth Road
Kissimmee, FL 34747
Represented By
Joel Patrick Jordan, III
Nelson Mullins. Riley & Scarborough
contact info
Defendant
Barton Malow Company
Defendant
RTM Engineering Consultants, LLC
a foreign corporation 7901 4th Street North Suite 300
St. Petersburg, FL 33702
Represented By
Thomas Kincaid McCraw, Jr
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Goudreau Plastering
3601 Saxon Blvd.
New Smyrna Beach, FL 32169
Defendant
Jonathan Nehmer + Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Scott Shannon
Lee/shoemaker, PLLC
contact info
Annica Mae Mattus
Lee/shoemaker PLLC
contact info
Mediator
Bruce Norris
Plaintiff
Rosemont Hotels, Inc.
a Florida corporation 3001 Sherberth Road
Kissimmee, FL 34747
Represented By
Joel Patrick Jordan, III
Nelson Mullins. Riley & Scarborough
contact info
Michael Keith Wilson
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Shaun A. Rechsteiner
Nelson Mullins Broad And Cassel
contact info
Paul Andrew Bennett
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Habitech Systems, Inc.
880 Airport RD Unit 110
Ormond Beach, FL 32174
ThirdParty Defendant
Spectra Holdings, Inc.
865 W Irving Park RD
Itasca, IL 60143
ThirdParty Defendant
Lotspeich Contracting, Inc.
16101 NW 54th Ave.
Miami, FL 33014
ThirdParty Defendant
Heichel Plumbing, Inc.
1260 Marshall Farms Road
Ocoee, FL 34761
ThirdParty Defendant
Hartford South, LLC
7326 South orange Ave
Orlando, FL 32809
ThirdParty Defendant
Goudreau Plastering
3601 Saxon Blvd.
New Smyrna Beach, FL 32169
ThirdParty Defendant
Glass Block Warehouse, L.C.
4425 SW Port Way
Palm City, FL 34990
ThirdParty Defendant
Del Air Heating
ThirdParty Defendant
CM Glazing LLC
ThirdParty Defendant
Air Conditioning & Refrigeration, LLC
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Lotspeich Contracting, Inc.
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Barton Malow Company

GPO Feb 20 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 2/20/2025. (bas, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
158 158 answer Answer to Crossclaim Tue 05/13 7:54 PM
ANSWER to157 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim by Jonathan Nehmer & Associates, Inc. by RTM Engineering Consultants, LLC.(McCraw, Thomas)
Related: [-]