California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:23-cv-05683
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2023
Terminated:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 03, 2024 3:12 AM PDT
Defendant
Hitachi Koki U.S.A., LTD.
Represented By
Neil M. Kliebenstein
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Samuel James Galvin
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Defendant
Koki Holdings Co., LTD.
Plaintiff
Timothy Kualii Kahae
Represented By
Adam John Kress
Johnson Becker, PLLC
contact info
Jordon Robert Harlan
Harlan Law, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 07, 2025
33 33 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 02/07 11:59 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Judge Jon S. Tigar re 32 STIPULATION. (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 02/07 5:59 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL PURSAUNT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Timothy Kualii Kahae.(Kress, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
31 31 utility Case Referred to Private ADR Tue 08/13 11:01 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
30 30 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/13 10:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 08/13/2024. Add parties or amend the pleadings due by 8/23/2024. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 2/20/2025. Defendant's expert disclosures due by 4/14/2025. Close of fact discovery due by 5/12/2025. Mediation deadline due by 05/12/2025. Rebuttal expert disclosure due by 6/9/2025. Close of Expert Discovery due by 8/11/2025. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2025 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Pretrial conference statement due by 2/6/2026. Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2026 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Jury Selection and Jury Trial (12 days) set for 3/9/2026 at 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
29 29 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial Tue 08/13 3:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/13/2024. Issues raised in the joint case management conference statement discussed. Scheduling order to be issued. Total Time in Court: 4 minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Adam Kress. Defendant Attorney: Neil Kliebenstein. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dms, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2024)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
28 28 misc Joint Case Management Statement Wed 07/31 11:48 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (AMENDED) filed by Hitachi Koki U.S.A., LTD.. (Galvin, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
27 27 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Mon 07/29 3:16 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Amended Joint Proposed Schedule by 8/2/2024. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2024 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 08/12/2024 at 2:00PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 28, 2024
26 26 order Order Sun 07/28 5:32 PM
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE The parties' most recent case management statement, ECF No. 23, proposes deadlines that do not, for the most part, consist of firm dates. Instead, the parties identify dates as occurring a certain number of months before trial, e.g., "9 months before trial date." Id. at 6. By August 2, 2024, the parties shall submit an amended proposed schedule using fixed dates for all deadlines, e.g., "July 25, 2025." The deadline for the hearing of any dispositive motions must be at least 71 days before the pretrial conference. The July 30, 2024, case management conference is continued to August 13, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Tigar, Jon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
25 25 order Order Tue 07/23 9:40 AM
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY by Jon S. Tigar The request to appear telephonically, ECF No. 24 , is granted. Counsel are reminded to check Judge Tigar's scheduling notes on the Court website. Parties do not need to file requests to appear telephonically as long as those notes indicate that civil case management hearings are proceeding through the use of telephone and/or video. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc4, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
24 24 misc Proposed Order Mon 07/22 4:16 PM
Proposed Order Granting Telephonic Appearance at July 30, 2024 Case Management Conference by Hitachi Koki U.S.A., LTD..(Galvin, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
23 23 misc Joint Case Management Statement Tue 07/16 3:56 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Hitachi Koki U.S.A., LTD.. (Galvin, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Thu 06/13 8:12 AM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2024 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties should be sent in one email to the CRD at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 7/29/2024 at 2:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (kc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
21 21 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 03/29 12:13 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Hitachi Koki U.S.A., LTD. identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine, Corporate Parent Koki Holdings Co., LTD., Corporate Parent Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd. for Hitachi Koki U.S.A., LTD.. (Kliebenstein, Neil)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 03/29 12:03 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Please re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents.*** Re:20 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Hitachi Koki U.S.A., LTD. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
20 20 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 03/28 8:45 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Hitachi Koki U.S.A., LTD. identifying Corporate Parent Koki Holdings Co., LTD. for Hitachi Koki U.S.A., LTD.. (Kliebenstein, Neil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/28 12:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Kualii Kahae. Koki Holdings Co., LTD. served on 12/26/2023, answer due 1/16/2024. (Kress, Adam)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 02/28 12:39 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety, using the event Summons Returned Executed.*** Re:18 Affidavit of Service filed by Timothy Kualii Kahae (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
18 18 service Affidavit of Service Tue 02/27 12:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Marie Sakanishi of KOKI HOLDINGS CO., LTD on December 26, 2023, filed by Timothy Kualii Kahae. (Kress, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/22 11:31 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 1/22/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Friday, January 19, 2024
16 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
15 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Timothy Kualii Kahae.. (Kress, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
14 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Galvin, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
13 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Hitachi Koki U.S.A., LTD. also known as Koki Holdings America, Ltd. (Galvin, Samuel) Modified on 1/12/2024 (krp, COURT STAFF). Modified Text on 1/12/2024 (krp, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
12 12 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 10 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
11 11 STIPULATION Re Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Hitachi Koki U.S.A., LTD.. (Galvin, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
10 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-18950246.) filed by Timothy Kualii Kahae. (Kress, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
9 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Timothy Kualii Kahae. (Harlan, Jordon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
8 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by not More than 30 days filed by Koki Holdings America, Ltd.. (Galvin, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
7 7 Summons Issued as to Hitachi Koki U.S.A., LTD., Koki Holdings Co., LTD. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 Proposed Summons. (Harlan, Jordon)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
5 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/17/2023. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 ***Filing Error. Disregard.*** Proposed Summons. (Harlan, Jordon) Modified Text on 11/3/2023 (krp, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
2 2 ***Filing Error. Disregard.*** Proposed Summons. (Harlan, Jordon) Modified Text on 11/3/2023 (krp, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Hitachi Koki U.S.A., LTD., Koki Holdings Co., LTD. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18804241.). Filed by Timothy Kualii Kahae.(Harlan, Jordon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***The court discourages the use of multiple summonses, but if they are used, they should be uploaded as a single PDF document. Additionally, one of the defendant's names is misspelled. This filing will not be processed by the clerk's office. Please re-file the Proposed Summons in its entirety.*** Re:3 Proposed Summons filed by Timothy Kualii Kahae,2 Proposed Summons filed by Timothy Kualii Kahae (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]