Oregon District Court
Judge:Mustafa T Kasubhai
Case #: 6:24-cv-00144
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Terminated:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 3:00 AM PDT
Defendant
City of Bend
Represented By
Lucas W. Reese
Garrett Hemann Robertson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Ponder
Represented By
Bernard R. Mazaheri
Mazaheri & Mazaheri
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, March 13, 2025
19 19 order Judgment Thu 03/13 4:05 PM
JUDGMENT signed on 03/13/2025 by Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Based on the Stipulated Motion for Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice (ECF No.17 ), IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure this action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs incurred in this action. (bd)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion for Judgment Fri 03/07 2:57 PM
ORDER by Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Stipulated Motion for Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice 17 . (bd)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
17 17 motion Judgment Fri 02/28 4:01 PM
Stipulated Motion for Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice . Filed by City of Bend. Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Lucas
16 16 order 1 - Scheduling Fri 02/28 1:40 PM
ORDER by Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: The Court having been notified that the parties have resolved the claims between them, all case deadlines and any trial date are VACATED. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. The parties are ordered to submit final papers or a joint status report within 60 days of the date of this order. (bd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
15 15 notice Settlement Notice Wed 02/26 5:09 PM
Notice of Settlement Filed by Christopher Ponder. (Mazaheri, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
14 14 oth_sup Declaration Fri 01/31 1:54 PM
Declaration of Luke W. Reese In Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment with Exhibits 1 to 7 . Filed by City of Bend. Related [+]
Related: [-] Motion for Summary Judgment12 .ese, Lucas
13 13 oth_sup Declaration Fri 01/31 1:52 PM
Declaration of Jason Maniscalco In Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment with Exhibits 1 to 8 . Filed by City of Bend. Related [+]
Related: [-] Motion for Summary Judgment12 .ese, Lucas
12 12 motion Summary Judgment Fri 01/31 1:45 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Lucas
Monday, November 25, 2024
11 11 oth_evt Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT Mon 11/25 2:36 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Mustafa Kasubhai to District Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Fri 09/27 1:44 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines9 . Discovery is to be completed by 1/2/2025. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/3/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due 30 days following the Court's ruling on any dispositive motions or, by 3/5/2025. Exchange of Expert Witness Disclosures are due 60 days following the Court's ruling on any dispositive motions or, by 4/17/2025. (bd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Wed 09/25 11:17 AM
Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by City of Bend. Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Lucas
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
minute Rule 16 Conference Tue 04/16 12:44 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. Discovery is to be completed by 10/4/2024. Dispositive Motions are due by 11/1/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due 30 days following the Court's ruling on any dispositive motions or, by 12/2/2024 if none are filed. Expert Disclosures are due 60 days following the Court's ruling on any dispositive motions or, by 1/17/2025 if none are filed. Bernard Mazaheri present as counsel for plaintiff. Lucas Reese present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: FTR - Courtroom 3. (ck)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
7 7 oth_doc Proposed Pretrial Order - Joint Thu 03/07 3:23 PM
Joint Proposed Pretrial Order Lodged & Rule 26 Status Report . Filed by All Defendants. Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Lucas
Thursday, February 29, 2024
order 1 - Scheduling Thu 02/29 9:55 AM
Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Rule 16 Conference is set for 4/16/2024 at 09:45AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The parties are ordered to call into the Court's conference line at least 5 minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. Call-in information will be sent by e-mail prior to the hearing. Please use a land line connection without external noise. The Court prohibits speaker phones due to the greatly diminished sound quality. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, consent to a magistrate judge, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the Court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. All deadlines are VACATED and will be reset at the Rule 16 Conference. Pronoun Usage : The parties and counsel are encouraged to advise the Court of their pronouns and honorifics (such as Ms., Mx., or Mr.). People appearing before this Court may provide their pronouns and honorifics in writing or orally when appearing for conferences, hearings, or trials. Attorneys are encouraged to identify their pronouns and honorifics in their signature lines when submitting documents for filing. Parties and counsel are instructed to address each other in all written documents and court proceedings by those previously identified pronouns and honorifics. (jk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/28 8:39 AM
Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by City of Bend. Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Lucas
Monday, January 29, 2024
4 4 5 pgs order Order Mon 01/29 4:10 PM
Case Management Order signed on 1/29/2024 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/23 5:27 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to City of Bend. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Tue 01/23 5:24 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 5/22/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/21/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 6/21/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/22 6:10 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9243994 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Christopher Ponder against City of Bend. (Mazaheri, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons