Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Timothy J Savage
Case #: 2:24-cv-00313
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2024
Terminated:Mar 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 21, 2024 6:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Everlane, Inc.
Plaintiff
Matthew Gomberg
Represented By
David Glanzberg
The Law Office Of David Glanzberg
contact info
Unrepresented Party
Everlane, Inc.
2170 FOLSOM STREET
SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94110


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, March 18, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/18 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Matthew Gomberg (Glanzberg, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/12 2:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Gomberg re: Oscar Preciado served Summons and Complaint upon Everlane, Inc. by Personal service. Everlane, Inc. served on 2/6/2024, answer due 2/27/2024. (Glanzberg, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
4 4 misc Letter Wed 01/31 2:37 PM
Letter dated January 31, 2024 by Matthew Gomberg. (Glanzberg, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/25 2:28 PM
ORDER THAT NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 2, 2024, THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A NOTICE WITH THE CLERK LISTING ALL CASES IN ANY COURT IN WHICH HE IS AND EVER WAS A PLAINTIFF SEEKING RELIEF UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT FOR THE DEFENDANTS FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE ACTS ACCESSIBILITY REQUIREMENTS. THE LIST SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION FOR EACH CASE: THE PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY(S); THE COURT IN WHICH THE ACTION WAS FILED; THE FULL CAPTION OF THE CASE; THE CASE NUMBER; THE NAME OF THE DEFENDANT(S) AND, IF ANY, THE DEFENDANTS ATTORNEY(S); AND THE DISPOSITION OF THE CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/25/24. 1/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 01/24 8:05 AM
Summons Issued as to Everlane, Inc. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/24/24. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 01/23 12:26 PM
COMPLAINT Matthew Gomberg against Everlane, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17208262.), filed by Matthew Gomberg.(Glanzberg, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form