Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Leslie Hoffman Price
Case #: 6:24-cv-00146
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2024
Terminated:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jul 21, 2024 6:01 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Lakisha Davis
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Willie F. Baucham
Represented By
Benjamin David Rust, II
Ben Rust Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/22 2:40 PM
NOTICE by Willie F. Baucham re21 Response in Opposition to Motion,20 Motion to Vacate MOTION to Reopen Case,18 Order Dismissing Case (Rust, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/01 4:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 Motion to Vacate MOTION to Reopen Case filed by United States of America. (Davis, Lakisha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/18 3:58 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Relief from Judgment by Willie F. Baucham. (Rust, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
19 19 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 01/24 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MGB)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 01/24 9:14 AM
ORDER: it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to comply. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/24/2025. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/22 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Fully Briefed Motion by Willie F. Baucham re16 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Authority,12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint With Prejudice ,15 Response in Opposition to Motion (Rust, Benjamin) Modified on 8/22/2024 to edit docket text (JDR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
16 16 notice NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Authority Fri 05/03 1:15 PM
NOTICE of supplemental authority re12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint With Prejudice by United States of America. (Davis, Lakisha)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/29 8:49 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint With Prejudice filed by Willie F. Baucham. (Rust, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
14 14 service Proof of service Fri 04/19 9:04 AM
RETURN of Service Executed on 2/20/2024 as to U.S. Attorney General by Willie F. Baucham(Rust, Benjamin) Modified text on 4/19/2024 (BD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Tracking Information
Monday, April 08, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/08 5:21 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 6 Order by United States of America. (Davis, Lakisha)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss Mon 04/08 5:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint With Prejudice by United States of America. (Davis, Lakisha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
11 11 service Proof of service Thu 02/15 11:13 AM
PROOF of service by Willie F. Baucham (Rust, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 02/06 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Benjamin David Rust, II on behalf of Willie F. Baucham. Lead Counsel: Bejamin D. Rust, II. (Rust, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 02/06 10:43 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Benjamin David Rust, II of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/05 4:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America with Jury Demand. filed by Willie F. Baucham.(Rust, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- VA Denial of Plaintiff's Claim
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 01/30 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Tue 01/30 3:22 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/30/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
5 5 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/24 4:53 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Wendy W. Berger. New case number: 6:24-cv-146-WWB-LHP. Judge Gregory A. Presnell no longer assigned to the case. (RN)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/24 3:20 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING case to the Honorable Wendy B. Berger to be considered with 6:23-cv-365-WWB-EJK, Willie F. Bauchman v United States of America. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/24/2024. (AKC)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued as to USA Wed 01/24 12:14 PM
SUMMONS issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JDR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/23 3:33 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-146-GAP-LHP. (JCG)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/23 2:17 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21687160) filed by Willie F. Baucham.(Rust, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons