New York Western District Court
Judge:Lawrence J Vilardo
Referred: H Kenneth Schroeder Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-00080
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 21, 2024 6:04 AM EDT
Defendant
LBFNY, LLC
Plaintiff
International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237
Represented By
Daniel E. Kornfeld
Blitman & King LLP
contact info
Daniel E Kornfeld
Blitman & King LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund
Represented By
Daniel E. Kornfeld
Blitman & King LLP
contact info
Daniel E Kornfeld
Blitman & King LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund
Represented By
Daniel E. Kornfeld
Blitman & King LLP
contact info
Daniel E Kornfeld
Blitman & King LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By
Daniel E. Kornfeld
Blitman & King LLP
contact info
Daniel E Kornfeld
Blitman & King LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
26 26 order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Stay Mon 03/10 11:41 AM
TEXT ORDER: In light of plaintiff's25 Status Report, Plaintiff's11 Motion to Compel is denied without prejudice. The parties are directed to file a Status Report on 5/15/2025 if this matter has not resolved. Issued by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 3/10/2025. (KER)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Status Report Mon 03/10 9:44 AM
STATUS REPORT by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237. (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
24 24 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/23 3:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LBFNY, LLC. (Kwiatkowski, Arianna)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
23 23 misc Letter Fri 12/20 10:29 AM
Letter filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237 . (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
utility Remark Thu 12/19 4:33 PM
ATTENTION ALL PLAINTIFFS OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and/or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
22 22 motion Stay Fri 12/13 1:53 PM
MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines by LBFNY, LLC.(Kwiatkowski, Arianna)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/13 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Arianna Elise Kwiatkowski on behalf of LBFNY, LLC (Kwiatkowski, Arianna)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
20 20 respm Reply/Response Fri 10/18 1:04 PM
REPLY/RESPONSE to re 18 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237. (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Reply/Response Fri 10/18 12:21 PM
REPLY/RESPONSE to re 18 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237. (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
18 18 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 09/20 4:53 PM
TEXT REFERRAL ORDER - Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr., United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 9/20/2024. (ZHM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
17 17 misc Letter Thu 09/19 2:05 PM
Letter filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237 . (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Tue 05/14 11:08 AM
Letter filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237 . (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
15 15 misc Letter Thu 04/11 11:21 AM
Letter filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237 . (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Text Order Thu 04/11 10:42 AM
TEXT ORDER re:11 MOTION to Compel Disclosure. Response due by 4/29/2024. Reply due by 5/13/2024. If necessary, the Court will schedule oral argument at a later time. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/11/2024. (DJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
13 13 service Certificate of Service Tue 04/09 7:51 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237 re11 MOTION to Compel Disclosure ,12 Affidavit,, (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
12 12 misc Affidavit Mon 04/08 11:39 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Daniel Kornfeld in Support of Motion to Compel Disclosure by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237.(Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Kornfeld Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Kornfeld Affidavit,
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Kornfeld Affidavit,
Att: 4 Exhibit D to Kornfeld Affidavit,
Att: 5 Memorandum in Support
11 11 motion Compel Mon 04/08 11:36 AM
MOTION to Compel Disclosure by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237.(Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
10 10 order Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/02 4:35 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to LBFNY, LLC This was mailed to: LBFNY, LLC,. (TMK)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
9 9 service Certificate of Service Fri 02/23 3:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237 (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 respoth Affidavit in Support Fri 02/23 3:30 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re7 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237. (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 02/23 3:28 PM
REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund against LBFNY, LLC. (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Wed 02/07 3:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Yenny Pinto, Office Manager on 01/31/2024, filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237. (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/31 10:56 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237. (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
utility Remark Tue 01/30 2:34 PM
ATTENTION ALL PLAINTIFFS OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and/or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
4 4 service Certificate of Service Wed 01/24 12:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Pension Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Annuity Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237 re1 Complaint, (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 01/24 11:13 AM
Summons Issued as to LBFNY, LLC. (TMK)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/24 10:59 AM
Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Wed 01/24 11:00 AM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation: the ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] .(TMK)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Wed 01/24 11:00 AM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
2 2 misc Continuation of Exhibits Tue 01/23 12:42 PM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare, Pension and Annuity Funds, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237. to1 Complaint, Summons filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare, Pension and Annuity Funds, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237. (Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/23 12:10 PM
COMPLAINT against LBFNY, LLC $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5087788, filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 237 Health & Welfare, Pension and Annuity Funds, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 237.(Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C