Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-17436

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Janet S Baer
Case #: 1:24-ap-00017
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
SCP Merchandising, LLC
1020 Olympic Drive
Batavia, IL 60510
Represented By
SCP Merchandising, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MacKenzie Niemetz
Represented By
Lynn A Toops
Cohen & Malad LLP
contact info
Samuel J Strauss
Turke & Strauss LLP
contact info
Lester A Ottenheimer, III
Ottenheimer Law Group, LLC
contact info
J Gerard Stranch, IV
Stranch Jennings & Garvey PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
23 23 order Agreed Order Tue 06/04 1:58 PM
Agreed Order to Stay Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Signed on 6/4/2024 (Roman, Felipe)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, May 17, 2024
22 22 utility U - Draft Order Fri 05/17 5:06 PM
Draft Order Related [+] is due by 5/31/2024. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, March 08, 2024
21 21 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Sun 03/10 7:39 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 05/17/2024 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer, , , . (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 12 Request for Issuance of Alias Summons
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
20 20 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/06 6:29 AM
(E)Order Granting Motion for Leave To Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Signed on 3/6/2024. (Green, Ron)
Related: [-] 19
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
19 19 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/05 12:12 PM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Michael C Iadevaia on behalf of MacKenzie Niemetz. (Iadevaia, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
18 18 misc Affidavit of Service (Do Not Use for Service of Summons) Tue 02/20 3:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Lester A Ottenheimer, III on behalf of MacKenzie Niemetz Related [+]. (Ottenheimer, III, Lester)
Related: [-] 15 Amended Complaint
17 17 1 pgs cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/20 3:31 PM
Summons Service Executed on SCP Merchandising, LLC Related [+]. (Ottenheimer, III, Lester)
Related: [-] 13 Alias Summons Issued
Thursday, February 15, 2024
16 16 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Thu 02/15 1:11 PM
The Hearing Scheduled for March 5, 2024 is Stricken Related [+]. Judge Not Sitting for Kane County Matters. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/14 11:11 AM
Amended Complaint by Lester A Ottenheimer, III on behalf of MacKenzie Niemetz against SCP Merchandising, LLC. Related [+]. (Ottenheimer, III, Lester)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, February 02, 2024
14 14 utility U - Corrective Entry Fri 02/02 3:12 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: PDF Error, Filer to Refile as Amended Related [+]. (Gomez, Denise)
Related: [-] 10 Amended Complaint
Thursday, February 01, 2024
13 13 court Alias Summons Issued (auto) Thu 02/01 9:08 AM
Alias Summons Issued on SCP Merchandising, LLC Answer Due 03/4/2024 (Admin)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Request for Issuance of Alias Summons Thu 02/01 9:08 AM
Request for Issuance of Alias Summons by MacKenzie Niemetz against SCP Merchandising, LLC. Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 3/8/2024 at 11:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Baer. (Ottenheimer, III, Lester)
Related: [-] 6 Amended Complaint,10 Amended Complaint
11 11 misc Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040) Thu 02/01 9:01 AM
Amended Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Lester A Ottenheimer, III on behalf of MacKenzie Niemetz Related [+]. (Ottenheimer, III, Lester)
Related: [-] 10 Amended Complaint
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/01 8:59 AM
Amended Complaint by Lester A Ottenheimer, III on behalf of MacKenzie Niemetz against SCP Merchandising, LLC. Related [+]. (Ottenheimer, III, Lester)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
9 9 utility U - Corrective Entry Tue 01/30 9:52 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: to correct lead bankruptcy number Related [+]. (Sullivan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
8 8 utility U - Corrective Entry Wed 01/24 10:04 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: PDF Error - See Entry6 Related [+]. (Sullivan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
7 7 misc Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040) Tue 01/23 4:02 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Lester A Ottenheimer, III on behalf of MacKenzie Niemetz Related [+]. (Ottenheimer, III, Lester)
Related: [-] 6 Amended Complaint
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/23 3:58 PM
Amended Complaint by Lester A Ottenheimer, III on behalf of MacKenzie Niemetz against SCP Merchandising, LLC. Related [+]. (Ottenheimer, III, Lester)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, January 22, 2024
5 5 misc Appearance Mon 01/22 12:26 PM
Amended Appearance Filed by Lester A Ottenheimer, III on behalf of MacKenzie Niemetz. (Ottenheimer, III, Lester)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Appearance Mon 01/22 12:24 PM
Appearance Filed by Lester A Ottenheimer, III on behalf of MacKenzie Niemetz. (Ottenheimer, III, Lester)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 01/22 11:26 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-00017 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47428185. Fee Amount $ 350.00 (Ottenheimer, III, Lester) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 01/22 11:23 AM
Summons Issued on SCP Merchandising, LLC Answer Due 02/21/2024 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/22 11:23 AM
Adversary case 24-00017 (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by MacKenzie Niemetz against SCP Merchandising, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 3/5/2024 at 11:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Baer. (Ottenheimer, III, Lester)
Related: [-]