Colorado District Court
Judge:Regina M Rodriguez
Case #: 1:24-cv-00196
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2024
Terminated:Jan 13, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jul 21, 2024 3:56 AM MDT
Defendant
Dylan Cox
Represented By
Robert McLeod
Hall Booth Smith, P.C.
contact info
Katherine Wilson Dandy
Hall Booth Smith PC
contact info
Brenda S. McClearn
Hall Booth Smith, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Katherine Crofton
Represented By
Katherine Wilson Dandy
Hall Booth Smith PC
contact info
Brenda S. McClearn
Hall Booth Smith, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Statler
Represented By
Katherine Wilson Dandy
Hall Booth Smith PC
contact info
Brenda S. McClearn
Hall Booth Smith, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Wellpath LLC
Represented By
Katherine Wilson Dandy
Hall Booth Smith PC
contact info
Brenda S. McClearn
Hall Booth Smith, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Tays Cruz
Represented By
Bryan E. Schmid
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Steven Ward Martyn
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Nathan James Whitney
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Meri V. Geringer
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Brandon Philip Hull
Overturf Mcgath & Hull, P.C.
contact info
Lindsey Warren Jay
Overturf Mcgath & Hull, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Kristina Kerl
Defendant
Cherie Nichols
Represented By
Bryan E. Schmid
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Steven Ward Martyn
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Nathan James Whitney
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Meri V. Geringer
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Brandon Philip Hull
Overturf Mcgath & Hull, P.C.
contact info
Lindsey Warren Jay
Overturf Mcgath & Hull, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Roybal
Represented By
Bryan E. Schmid
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Steven Ward Martyn
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Nathan James Whitney
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Meri V. Geringer
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Brandon Philip Hull
Overturf Mcgath & Hull, P.C.
contact info
Lindsey Warren Jay
Overturf Mcgath & Hull, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Poppell
Represented By
Ciara Shelbi Danner
Gerash Steiner Blanton PC
contact info
Michael West Blanton
Gerash Steiner, P.C.
contact info
Daniel P. Gerash
Gerash Steiner, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole (I) Poppell
Represented By
Ciara Shelbi Danner
Gerash Steiner Blanton PC
contact info
Michael West Blanton
Gerash Steiner, P.C.
contact info
Daniel P. Gerash
Gerash Steiner, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Board of County Commissioners for El Paso County, Colorado, The
Terminated: 03/13/2024
Represented By
Bryan E. Schmid
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Steven Ward Martyn
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Nathan James Whitney
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Meri V. Geringer
El Paso County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Brandon Philip Hull
Overturf Mcgath & Hull, P.C.
contact info
Lindsey Warren Jay
Overturf Mcgath & Hull, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, March 21, 2025
127 127 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 03/21 9:44 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs Nicole (I) Poppell, Nicole Poppell. (Blanton, Michael)
Related: [-]