Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Case #: 1:24-cv-00199
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 21, 2024 3:56 AM MDT
Defendant
Alyssa Aarhaus
Represented By
Clayton Jeffrey Ankney
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Kyle M. Holter
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Charles Beatty
Represented By
Clayton Jeffrey Ankney
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Kyle M. Holter
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jason Byrnes
Represented By
Clayton Jeffrey Ankney
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Kyle M. Holter
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Kelsie McCallum
Represented By
Clayton Jeffrey Ankney
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Kyle M. Holter
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Bren Rogers
Represented By
Clayton Jeffrey Ankney
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Kyle M. Holter
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Virginia Usher
Represented By
Clayton Jeffrey Ankney
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Kyle M. Holter
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
David Morrill
[E-filer effective 1/25/2024] 7232 Braun Court
Arvada, CO 80005

GPO Nov 26 2024
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 26 November 2024. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 41 be GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's claims be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, )
GPO Mar 14 2025
mplaint on or before April 14, 2025.(dgumb, ) Modified on 3/14/2025 to edit text (dgumb, ). ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/14/2025, re: 59 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge is ACCEPTED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Objection to Court's Recommendation to Dismiss Amended Complaint is OVERRULED [Docket No. 60] and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint [Docket No. 60] is DENIED. ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint [Docket No. 41] is GRANTED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Objection to Court's Recommendation [Docket No. 61] is DENIED. ORDERED that all of plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. ORDERED that plaintiff David Morrill may file a motion for leave to file an amended co

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
67 67 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 04/11 2:37 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/11/2025 re:66 the letter from plaintiff's counsel, construed as a motion for an extension time to file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint, is GRANTED . Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint on or before May 14, 2025 . Counsel is reminded that future requests for relief shall be submitted in the form of a motion that complies with § III of the Court's Practice Standards. See Practice Standards (Civil Cases), Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer, § III. Text Only Entry(pabsec, )
Related: [-]
66 66 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/11 1:06 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for leave to file Amended Complaint by Plaintiff David Morrill. (Sullivan, Richard)
Related: [-]
65 65 misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Fri 04/11 8:26 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:64 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Richard L. Sullivan. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents. Also, the document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). (Text Only Entry) (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
64 64 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 04/10 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard L. Sullivan on behalf of David MorrillAttorney Richard L. Sullivan added to party David Morrill(pty:pla) (Sullivan, Richard)
Related: [-]