Anne Arundel Co MD v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00384 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Maryland, 1:23-cv-03518 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 21, 2024 6:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
|
|
Defendant
UNITED HEALTH GROUP INC.
|
|
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Optumrx Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121 |
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
|
|
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
Cigna Group
|
|
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
|
|
Plaintiff
Anne Arundel Co MD
2660 Riva Road 4th Floor
ANNAPOLIS, MD 21401 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT Anne Arundel Co. Md against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Anne Arundel Co MD.(KO, DAVID) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anne Arundel Co MD. Cigna Group waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024; EVERNORTH HEALTH INC. waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024; EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC. waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024; EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC. waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024; Express Scripts Inc. waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024; MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC. waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Change of Address by LAURA R GERBER (GERBER, LAURA) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anne Arundel Co MD. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C. waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
12 | 12
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anne Arundel Co MD. Optum Inc. waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024; Optumrx Inc. waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024; UNITED HEALTH GROUP INC. waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
11 | 11
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anne Arundel Co MD. CAREMARK L.L.C. waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024; CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024; CAREMARK RX L.L.C. waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024; CVS HEALTH CORPORATION waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024; CVS PHARMACY INC. waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
10 | 10
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anne Arundel Co MD. NOVO NORDISK INC. waiver sent on 2/9/2023, answer due 4/10/2023. (KO, DAVID) |
|
9 | 9
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anne Arundel Co MD. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Clerk's Notice to Counsel: Pursuant to CTO Number 9 entered in MDL No. 3080, District of Maryland, case number 1:23-cv-03518 has been transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned civil action number: 2 23-23042 In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL 3080. (krg, ) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:23-cv-03518. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 01/23 3:09 PM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg, ) |
||
utility
Create Case Association
Tue 01/23 3:11 PM
Cases associated to 2:23-md-03080-BRM-RLS. (krg, ) |
||
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. Signed by Tiffany D. Pete,Clerk of the Panel on 1/19/2024. #1 Letter) (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Laura R Gerber. Directing attorney Laura R Gerber to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 1/2/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) | |
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Friday, December 29, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Case Reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |