Ray v. Proctor & Gamble et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Truncale |
Referred: | Zack Hawthorn |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00025 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:2003 Job Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 4:24 AM CDT |
Defendant
AFM-SAG-AFTRA
|
|
Defendant
ATX Orthopedics
|
|
Defendant
B-Reel LLC
|
|
Defendant
Caps Inc
|
|
Defendant
Extreme Reach Payroll Services
|
|
Defendant
Gallagher-Basset Law Firm
|
|
Defendant
Gamut Capitol Management
|
|
Defendant
Proctor & Gamble
|
|
Defendant
Publicis Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Saatchi & Saatchi NY
|
|
Defendant
Screen Actors Guild
|
|
Defendant
Screen Actors Guild Board of Trustees
|
|
Defendant
Screen Actors Guilt Health Plan Board
|
|
Defendant
Steen Chiropractic and Physical Therapy
|
|
Defendant
Stephanie Allain
|
|
Defendant
B Marc Allen
|
|
Defendant
Daryl Anderson
|
|
Defendant
Helayne Antler
|
|
Defendant
Amy Aquino
|
|
Defendant
Sean Astin
|
|
Defendant
Jane Austin
|
|
Defendant
Trish Avery
|
|
Defendant
Amanda Barlow
|
|
Defendant
Shari Belafonte
|
|
Defendant
Mark F Biegger
|
|
Defendant
Brett Biggs
|
|
Defendant
Steven D Bishop
|
|
Defendant
Darcy Bloom
|
|
Defendant
Sheila Bonini
|
|
Defendant
Lei Bowen
|
|
Defendant
Diana Boylston
|
|
Defendant
Jim Bracchitta
|
|
Defendant
Angela F Braly
|
|
Defendant
John Carter Brown
|
|
Defendant
Suzanne Burkhead
|
|
Defendant
Bob Butler
|
|
Defendant
Gabrielle Cartis
|
|
Defendant
Amy L Chang
|
|
Defendant
Alvin Chavis
|
|
Defendant
Tiffany Chung
|
|
Defendant
Giovanni Ciserani
|
|
Defendant
Pat Coil
|
|
Defendant
Shannon Cook
|
|
Defendant
Eric Cowden
|
|
Defendant
Duncan Crabtree-Ireland
|
|
Defendant
Rebecca Damon
|
|
Defendant
Garret Danks
|
|
Defendant
Donald De Line
|
|
Defendant
George Dishner
|
|
Defendant
Fran Drescher
|
|
Defendant
Mathis Dunn
|
|
Defendant
Melanie Ferguson
|
|
Defendant
Tony Filson
|
|
Defendant
Joely Fisher
|
|
Defendant
Tino Gagliardi
|
|
Defendant
Vanessa Gaitan
|
|
Defendant
Sean Gallagher
|
|
Defendant
Colin Gilbert
|
|
Defendant
Barry Gordon
|
|
Defendant
J Keith Gorham
|
|
Defendant
Pamela Greenwalt
|
|
Defendant
James Harrington
|
|
Defendant
David Hartley-Margolin
|
|
Defendant
Cort L Hessler
|
|
Defendant
Don Howe
|
|
Defendant
Michelle Hurd
|
|
Defendant
Tracy Hyman
|
|
Defendant
Shaliesh Jejurikar
|
|
Defendant
Joseph Jimenez
|
|
Defendant
Robert W Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Sheldon Kasdan
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Kempczinski
|
|
Defendant
Matt King
|
|
Defendant
Ezra Knight
|
|
Defendant
Lynne Lambert
|
|
Defendant
Marisa Leal
|
|
Defendant
Debra L Lee
|
|
Defendant
Laura Lewis
|
|
Defendant
Allan Linderman
|
|
Defendant
Carol A Lombardini
|
|
Defendant
Jodi Long
|
|
Defendant
Terry J Lundren
|
|
Defendant
Deborah P Majoras
|
|
Defendant
Stacy K Marcus
|
|
Defendant
Richard Masur
|
|
Defendant
Christine M McCarthy
|
|
Defendant
Mykle McCoslin
|
|
Defendant
Ashley McEvoy
|
|
Defendant
John T McGuire
|
|
Defendant
Diane P Mirowski
|
|
Defendant
Michael Mobley
|
|
Defendant
Jon Moeller
|
|
Defendant
Kathryn Moore
|
|
Defendant
Stephanie Mothershed
|
|
Defendant
Paul Muratore
|
|
Defendant
Dan Navarro
|
|
Defendant
Van Nguyen
|
|
Defendant
Arianna Ozzanto
|
|
Defendant
Sam Pearcy
|
|
Defendant
Martin Pederson
|
|
Defendant
Janice Pendarvis
|
|
Defendant
Pat Perez
|
|
Defendant
Johan Perjus
|
|
Defendant
Michael Pniewski
|
|
Defendant
Dave Pomeroy
|
|
Defendant
Robert J Portman
|
|
Defendant
Linda Powell
|
|
Defendant
Marc S Pritchard
|
|
Defendant
Michele Proude
|
|
Defendant
Guy Ragans
|
|
Defendant
Sheryl Lee Ralph
|
|
Defendant
Waleska Rivera
|
|
Defendant
Michelle A Robinson
|
|
Defendant
Ray Rodriquez
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Rogers
|
|
Defendant
Sheila Wilk Rosenberg
|
|
Defendant
Cynthia Sanchez
|
|
Defendant
Julie Sandell
|
|
Defendant
Marc Sandman
|
|
Defendant
Lucy Santamassino
|
|
Defendant
Megan Saturley
|
|
Defendant
Tom Schwarz
|
|
Defendant
Valerie L Sheppard
|
|
Defendant
Pete Simonte
|
|
Defendant
Ted Sinclaire
|
|
Defendant
Erika Slay
|
|
Defendant
Susan Sprung
|
|
Defendant
Aaron Stadler
|
|
Defendant
Kenneth Steen
|
|
Defendant
Kim Stevens
|
|
Defendant
Sally Stevens
|
|
Defendant
Rajesh Subramaniam
|
|
Defendant
Marilyn Swick
|
|
Defendant
Chris Synoground
|
|
Defendant
Carolyn M Tastad
|
|
Defendant
Sidney Taub
|
|
Defendant
Morgan Tennant
|
|
Defendant
Peter Drago Tiemann
|
|
Defendant
Justin Touretz
|
|
Defendant
Katie Tull
|
|
Defendant
Lara Unger
|
|
Defendant
Jessica Vasquez
|
|
Defendant
Ned Vaughn
|
|
Defendant
Michael Viera
|
|
Defendant
Sarah Wanezek
|
|
Defendant
Phil Weis
|
|
Defendant
David Weissman
|
|
Defendant
Russell Wetanson
|
|
Defendant
David S White
|
|
Defendant
Tracee Wilkins
|
|
Defendant
Colleen Williams
|
|
Defendant
Patricia A Woertz
|
|
Defendant
David Wolfson
|
|
Defendant
Evan Worley
|
|
Defendant
Mike Yarbro
|
|
Defendant
Heidi Young
|
|
Plaintiff
Jasmine Ray
901 12th Street Suite 188
Hempstead, TX 77445 |
Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, February 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable:3 Order sent to Jasmine Ray at 901 12th Street (tkd, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 02/14 9:23 AM
Case transferred to the Western District of Texas, Austin Division (tkd, ) |
||
utility
Remark
Wed 02/14 10:50 AM
Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in Western District of Texas as case 1:24-cv-00153, filed 02/14/2024 (tkd, ) |
||
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the US District Court for the Western District of TX, Austin Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/25/24. (tkd, ) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jasmine Ray. (tkd, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jasmine Ray.(tkd, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/23 4:36 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn pursuant to a Standing Order (tkd, ) |