Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00196
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 24, 2024 1:30 AM CST
Defendant
Jake Allen Wynn (1)
Represented By
Minerva Torres
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 01/24/2024 1:54 AM CST
Sunday, January 21, 2024
Arrest of Jake Allen Wynn (drda)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Jake Allen Wynn. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Jake Allen Wynn. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Jake Allen Wynn. (drda)
Related: [-]