Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt v. Mission Inn et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00553 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 19, 2024 1:32 AM PDT |
Defendant
AT and T Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Aaron Thomas 49ers Coach
|
|
Defendant
Agropeouaria El Cristiano
|
|
Defendant
Air Force Memorial
|
|
Defendant
Albertson Grocery
|
|
Defendant
Charlotte Amalie
|
|
Defendant
American Airlines Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amsterdam The Nethelands
|
|
Defendant
Amunden-Scott South Pole Station
|
|
Defendant
Anaconcla, Deer Lodge County Montana
|
|
Defendant
Anglican Church of Canada
|
|
Defendant
Anglican Church of Southern Africa
|
|
Defendant
Archdiocese of Florence
|
|
Defendant
Archdiocese of San Antonio
|
|
Defendant
BP PIC
|
|
Defendant
Bay Ridge, Brooklyn New York
|
|
Defendant
Borough of Fort Lee
|
|
Defendant
Broadway Technology
|
|
Defendant
Bud, West Virginia
|
|
Defendant
Buddhist Temple
|
|
Defendant
Bulle, Switzerland
|
|
Defendant
Cambodia
|
|
Defendant
Camp Stephens Conferderate Camp
|
|
Defendant
Canadian Football League
|
|
Defendant
Canary Islands
|
|
Defendant
Canelones, Uruguay
|
|
Defendant
Canterbury Cathedral
|
|
Defendant
Carhedral and Collegiate Church of St. Saviour and St Mary Overie
|
|
Defendant
Carmel Mar Thoma Center
|
|
Defendant
Carson CA
|
|
Defendant
Cathedral of Christ the Light
|
|
Defendant
Cathedral of Saint Stephen, Vienna
|
|
Defendant
Cathedral-Brisilica of Notre Dame de Quebec
|
|
Defendant
Central High School
|
|
Defendant
Century City Chamber of Commerce
|
|
Defendant
China Investment Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Christ the King
|
|
Defendant
Christian Church Central Rocky Mountain Region
|
|
Defendant
Christian Church Great River Region
|
|
Defendant
Christian Church in Georgia
|
|
Defendant
Christian Church in Oklahoma
|
|
Defendant
Church of South India
|
|
Defendant
Churchill Downs
|
|
Defendant
City of Commerse
|
|
Defendant
City of Industry
|
|
Defendant
City of Sunray
|
|
Defendant
Clarence, NY
|
|
Defendant
Coasta Florida Sports Park
|
|
Defendant
Cocoa Florida
|
|
Defendant
Comcast Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Commonwealth Joint Office in New York
|
|
Defendant
Corpus Christi Church
|
|
Defendant
Corpus Christi International Airport
|
|
Defendant
Creatures Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Crown Heights Jewish Community Council
|
|
Defendant
Crown International
|
|
Defendant
Crown Royal
|
|
Defendant
DeWalt Industrial Tool Company
|
|
Defendant
Definition
|
|
Defendant
Postmaster General Louis Dejoy
|
|
Defendant
Delta Zeta Sorority
|
|
Defendant
Department of Health and Social Care
|
|
Defendant
Devils Backbone State Natural Area
|
|
Defendant
Diocese of Lincoln
|
|
Defendant
Diocese of North America and Europe
|
|
Defendant
Disciples Center
|
|
Defendant
Eastern Star Home Archer School for Girls
|
|
Defendant
Eiken Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Embassy of the Sultanate of Oman
|
|
Defendant
Emory Decatur Hospital
|
|
Defendant
EuropaCorp S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Federation of Astronomical Societies
|
|
Defendant
First United Methodist Church of Hammond
|
|
Defendant
Florence Hightingale Faculity of Nursing and Midwifery
|
|
Defendant
Fort Foster State Historic Site
|
|
Defendant
Gaylord National Resort and Convention Center
|
|
Defendant
Gemiler Island
|
|
Defendant
Georgetown University
|
|
Defendant
Gurdwara Nankana Sahib
|
|
Defendant
Harimandir Sahib
|
|
Defendant
Harman International Industries
|
|
Defendant
Headquarters of the United Nations
|
|
Defendant
Hohenwald Tennessee
|
|
Defendant
Hollywood, Florida
|
|
Defendant
Holy Cross, Victoria
|
|
Defendant
Holy Family Catholic Church
|
|
Defendant
Holy Trinity and All Saints
|
|
Defendant
Honeymoon Island State Park
|
|
Defendant
Hooked on Phonics Canada
|
|
Defendant
Indiana Government Center
|
|
Defendant
Indiana Government Center South
|
|
Defendant
Institute of Christ the King Sovereign Priest
|
|
Defendant
International Air Transport Association
|
|
Defendant
Ionian Islands
|
|
Defendant
Istanbul, Turkey
|
|
Defendant
Kartarpur
|
|
Defendant
Kindle Direct Publishing
|
|
Defendant
King County Washington
|
|
Defendant
Kings College Hospital
|
|
Defendant
Kings College London
|
|
Defendant
Kuwait Investment Authority
|
|
Defendant
LG Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Las Vegas Nevada
|
|
Defendant
Lee County, Alabama
|
|
Defendant
Lincolnshire County Council
|
|
Defendant
Moshe Lion
|
|
Defendant
Liverpool, Walton
|
|
Defendant
London Borough of Lambeth
|
|
Defendant
Long Beach CA
|
|
Defendant
Long Beach Catholic Regional School
|
|
Defendant
Lunds Universitet
|
|
Defendant
Lynnwood, Washington
|
|
Defendant
Macys Inc Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Madjid Bilal Islamic Center
|
|
Defendant
Mario Kart Bowsers Chalienga
|
|
Defendant
Mark Anthony Brewing
|
|
Defendant
Mark Anthony Wine and Spirits
|
|
Defendant
Mary Star of the Sea Catholic Church
|
|
Defendant
Mary Star of the Sea Elementary
|
|
Defendant
Mary Star of the Sea High School
|
|
Defendant
Mary Star of the Sea Parish Hall
|
|
Defendant
Marysville City Hall
|
|
Defendant
McCormick and Company
|
|
Defendant
McDonalds Headquarters
|
|
Defendant
Memorial University
|
|
Defendant
Merck and Co., Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mesivta
|
|
Defendant
Microsoft Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mission Inn
|
|
Defendant
Mission Motel
|
|
Defendant
Mitsubishi Group
|
|
Defendant
Monastery of the Angels
|
|
Defendant
Ruben Rocha Moya
|
|
Defendant
Municipality of Larissa
|
|
Defendant
NOAA National Oceanis and Atmospheric Administration
|
|
Defendant
National Collegiate Athletic Association
|
|
Defendant
National Weather Service
|
|
Defendant
Navy Expeditionary Combat Command
|
|
Defendant
Newfoundland and Labrador
|
|
Defendant
Nippon Electric Glass
|
|
Defendant
Olympic Community Police Station
|
|
Defendant
Olympic Refuge Foundation
|
|
Defendant
Orden de la Compania de Maria, N.S.
|
|
Defendant
Our Lady of Sorrows, Corona
|
|
Defendant
Panasonic Holdings Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Papal Basilica of Saint Peter in the Vatican
|
|
Defendant
Foster Park
|
|
Defendant
Phenix City, Alabama
|
|
Defendant
Pizza Hut Headquarters
|
|
Defendant
Portico of San Luca
|
|
Defendant
Priestly Fraternity of Saint Peter
|
|
Defendant
Prince George County, Maryland
|
|
Defendant
Rabbinical College of Long Island
|
|
Defendant
Ebranim Raisi
|
|
Defendant
Abdul Latif Rashid
|
|
Defendant
Republic of Haiti
|
|
Defendant
Republic of Paraguay
|
|
Defendant
Rochester Zen Center
|
|
Defendant
Roman Catholic Diocese of Saint Joseph at Irkutsk
|
|
Defendant
Romano Catholic Diocese of Motherwell
|
|
Defendant
Saint Catherines Monastery
|
|
Defendant
Saint Leo Roman Catholic Church
|
|
Defendant
Sams Club
|
|
Defendant
Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Samsung Group
|
|
Defendant
Samsung Research America
|
|
Defendant
Sanctuary of the Madonna of San Luca
|
|
Defendant
Santa Barbara City Hall
|
|
Defendant
Santa Clarita
|
|
Defendant
Santa Susanna at the Baths of Diocletian
|
|
Defendant
Sears Roebuck and Co.
|
|
Defendant
Seattle Washington
|
|
Defendant
Sheepshead Bay
|
|
Defendant
Shell PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kara-ool Sholban Valerievich
|
|
Defendant
Smithtown NY
|
|
Defendant
South Bend, Indiana
|
|
Defendant
South Weddington Park
|
|
Defendant
Southern California Edison
|
|
Defendant
Southwest Airlines
|
|
Defendant
Sovereign Military Hospital Order of St. John of Jerusalem
|
|
Defendant
Specola Vaticana Vatican Observatory
|
|
Defendant
St Marys City Hall
|
|
Defendant
St Michaels Abbey
|
|
Defendant
St Patricks Cathedral
|
|
Defendant
St Patricks Catholic American Parish in Rome
|
|
Defendant
St Patricks Parish
|
|
Defendant
St Stephens Coatbridge Catholic Church
|
|
Defendant
St Thomas More Catholic Church
|
|
Defendant
St. Patricks Catholic Church
|
|
Defendant
Stanley Black and Deckers, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Star Bucks
|
|
Defendant
Star City, Russia
|
|
Defendant
Starrett City Management
|
|
Defendant
Stephens County Georgia
|
|
Defendant
Sterling Partners
|
|
Defendant
Stevenage Borough Council
|
|
Defendant
Stevens Pass Ski Resort
|
|
Defendant
Summit University Press
|
|
Defendant
Sun City, Menifee, California
|
|
Defendant
Sun City, Texas
|
|
Defendant
Sunland Ford
|
|
Defendant
Sunset Valley, Texas
|
|
Defendant
Supreme Electronics
|
|
Defendant
Sustainable Apparel Coalition
|
|
Defendant
Temple University
|
|
Defendant
Thailand
|
|
Defendant
The Benedictine Confederation
|
|
Defendant
The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
|
|
Defendant
The Church of Scotland
|
|
Defendant
The Collego of St George
|
|
Defendant
The Commonwealth
|
|
Defendant
The Imperial Grand Black Chapter of Bristish Commonwealth
|
|
Defendant
The Kingdome
|
|
Defendant
The Mosque Cares
|
|
Defendant
The Order of Friars Minor
|
|
Defendant
The Organization of World Heritage Cities
|
|
Defendant
The St. Thomas More Society of Los Angeles
|
|
Defendant
The UNEP World Conservatin Monitoring Centre
|
|
Defendant
Tho Proctor and Gamble Company
|
|
Defendant
Town of Glen St. Mary
|
|
Defendant
Trinity Broadcasting Network
|
|
Defendant
Triple Five Group
|
|
Defendant
Tulane University of Louisiana
|
|
Defendant
Turku Cathedral
|
|
Defendant
U.S. Naval Academy
|
|
Defendant
USSSA Space Coast Complex
|
|
Defendant
United Airlines Corporation HQ
|
|
Defendant
United Church of Canada
|
|
Defendant
United States Air Force
|
|
Defendant
Universal City, Texas
|
|
Defendant
University of Aberdeen
|
|
Defendant
University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill
|
|
Defendant
University of Tokyo Animation
|
|
Defendant
Universtiy of the Incarnate Word Corpus Christi Center
|
|
Defendant
Vatican Observatory
|
|
Defendant
Victoria Texas
|
|
Defendant
Washoe County, Nevada
|
|
Defendant
Weed, California
|
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt
12035 S Broadway No. K
Los Angeles, CA 90061 |
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE)2 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (rolm) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap) |
|
Sunday, January 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
![]() REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt. (ghap) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT filed against Defendants AT and T Inc., Aaron Thomas 49ers Coach, Agropeouaria El Cristiano, Air Force Memorial, Albertson Grocery, Charlotte Amalie, American Airlines Corporation, Amsterdam The Nethelands, Amunden-Scott South Pole Station, Anaconcla, Deer Lodge County Montana, Anglican Church of Canada, Anglican Church of Southern Africa, Archdiocese of Florence, Archdiocese of San Antonio, BP PIC, Bay Ridge, Brooklyn New York, Borough of Fort Lee, Broadway Technology, Bud, West Virginia, Buddhist Temple, Bulle, Switzerland, Cambodia, Camp Stephens Conferderate Camp, Canadian Football League, Canary Islands, Canelones, Uruguay, Canterbury Cathedral, Carhedral and Collegiate Church of St. Saviour and St Mary Overie, Carmel Mar Thoma Center, Carson CA, Cathedral of Christ the Light, Cathedral of Saint Stephen, Vienna, Cathedral-Brisilica of Notre Dame de Quebec, Central High School, Century City Chamber of Commerce, China Investment Corporation, Christ the King, Christian Church Central Rocky Mountain Region, Christian Church Great River Region, Christian Church in Georgia, Christian Church in Oklahoma, Church of South India, Churchill Downs, City of Commerse, City of Industry, City of Sunray, Clarence, NY, Coasta Florida Sports Park, Cocoa Florida, Comcast Corporation, Commonwealth Joint Office in New York, Corpus Christi Church, Corpus Christi International Airport, Creatures Inc., Crown Heights Jewish Community Council, Crown International, Crown Royal, DeWalt Industrial Tool Company, Definition, Louis Dejoy, Delta Zeta Sorority, Department of Health and Social Care, Devils Backbone State Natural Area, Diocese of Lincoln, Diocese of North America and Europe, Disciples Center, Eastern Star Home Archer School for Girls, Eiken Co., Ltd, Embassy of the Sultanate of Oman, Emory Decatur Hospital, EuropaCorp S.A., Federation of Astronomical Societies, First United Methodist Church of Hammond, Florence Hightingale Faculity of Nursing and Midwifery, Fort Foster State Historic Site, Gaylord National Resort and Convention Center, Gemiler Island, Georgetown University, Gurdwara Nankana Sahib, Harimandir Sahib, Harman International Industries, Headquarters of the United Nations, Hohenwald Tennessee, Hollywood, Florida, Holy Cross, Victoria, Holy Family Catholic Church, Holy Trinity and All Saints, Honeymoon Island State Park, Hooked on Phonics Canada, Indiana Government Center, Indiana Government Center South, Institute of Christ the King Sovereign Priest, International Air Transport Association, Ionian Islands, Istanbul, Turkey, Kartarpur, Kindle Direct Publishing, King County Washington, Kings College Hospital, Kings College London, Kuwait Investment Authority, LG Corporation, Las Vegas Nevada, Lee County, Alabama, Lincolnshire County Council, Moshe Lion, Liverpool, Walton, London Borough of Lambeth, Long Beach CA, Long Beach Catholic Regional School, Lunds Universitet, Lynnwood, Washington, Macys Inc Corporation, Madjid Bilal Islamic Center, Mario Kart Bowsers Chalienga, Mark Anthony Brewing, Mark Anthony Wine and Spirits, Mary Star of the Sea Catholic Church, Mary Star of the Sea Elementary, Mary Star of the Sea High School, Mary Star of the Sea Parish Hall, Marysville City Hall, McCormick and Company, McDonalds Headquarters, Memorial University, Merck and Co., Inc, Mesivta, Microsoft Corporation, Mission Inn, Mission Motel, Mitsubishi Group, Monastery of the Angels, Ruben Rocha Moya, Municipality of Larissa, NOAA National Oceanis and Atmospheric Administration, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Weather Service, Navy Expeditionary Combat Command, Newfoundland and Labrador, Nippon Electric Glass, Olympic Community Police Station, Olympic Refuge Foundation, Orden de la Compania de Maria, N.S., Our Lady of Sorrows, Corona, Panasonic Holdings Corporation, Papal Basilica of Saint Peter in the Vatican, Foster Park, Phenix City, Alabama, Pizza Hut Headquarters, Portico of San Luca, Priestly Fraternity of Saint Peter, Prince George County, Maryland, Rabbinical College of Long Island, Ebranim Raisi, Abdul Latif Rashid, Republic of Haiti, Republic of Paraguay, Rochester Zen Center, Roman Catholic Diocese of Saint Joseph at Irkutsk, Romano Catholic Diocese of Motherwell, Saint Catherines Monastery, Saint Leo Roman Catholic Church, Sams Club, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd, Samsung Group, Samsung Research America, Sanctuary of the Madonna of San Luca, Santa Barbara City Hall, Santa Clarita, Santa Susanna at the Baths of Diocletian, Sears Roebuck and Co., Seattle Washington, Sheepshead Bay, Shell PLC, Kara-ool Sholban Valerievich, Smithtown NY, South Bend, Indiana, South Weddington Park, Southern California Edison, Southwest Airlines, Sovereign Military Hospital Order of St. John of Jerusalem, Specola Vaticana Vatican Observatory, St Marys City Hall, St Michaels Abbey, St Patricks Cathedral, St Patricks Catholic American Parish in Rome, St Patricks Parish, St Stephens Coatbridge Catholic Church, St Thomas More Catholic Church, St. Patricks Catholic Church, Stanley Black and Deckers, Inc., Star Bucks, Star City, Russia, Starrett City Management, Stephens County Georgia, Sterling Partners, Stevenage Borough Council, Stevens Pass Ski Resort, Summit University Press, Sun City, Menifee, California, Sun City, Texas, Sunland Ford, Sunset Valley, Texas, Supreme Electronics, Sustainable Apparel Coalition, Temple University, Thailand, The Benedictine Confederation, The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, The Church of Scotland, The Collego of St George, The Commonwealth, The Imperial Grand Black Chapter of Bristish Commonwealth, The Kingdome, The Mosque Cares, The Order of Friars Minor, The Organization of World Heritage Cities, The St. Thomas More Society of Los Angeles, The UNEP World Conservatin Monitoring Centre, Tho Proctor and Gamble Company, Town of Glen St. Mary, Trinity Broadcasting Network, Triple Five Group(official capacity), Tulane University of Louisiana, Turku Cathedral, U.S. Naval Academy, USSSA Space Coast Complex, United Airlines Corporation HQ, United Church of Canada, United States Air Force, Universal City, Texas, University of Aberdeen, University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, University of Tokyo Animation, Universtiy of the Incarnate Word Corpus Christi Center, Vatican Observatory, Victoria Texas, Washoe County, Nevada, Weed, California Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi., filed by plaintiff Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt. (ghap) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |