Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:John Robert Blakey
Case #: 1:14-cv-09214
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2014
Terminated:Apr 30, 2015
Last checked: Sunday May 17, 2015 8:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Aktarer Zaman
Represented By
Nicholas R. Cassie
Bla Schwartz, PC
contact info
Irwin B. Schwartz
Bla Schwartz
contact info
Fitzgerald Timothy Bramwell
The Law Offices Of Fitzgerald Bramwill
contact info
Plaintiff
United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew J Caccamo
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
John Sheldon Letchinger
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Frank T. Blechschmidt
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Orbitz Worldwide, LLC
Terminated: 02/17/2015
Represented By
Matthew J Caccamo
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
John Sheldon Letchinger
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Frank T. Blechschmidt
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Orbitz, LLC
Terminated: 02/17/2015
Represented By
Matthew J Caccamo
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
John Sheldon Letchinger
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Frank T. Blechschmidt
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 30 2015
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/30/2015. Mailed notice(gel, )

1. Judge throws out United Airlines lawsuit against 22-year-old (money.cnn.com)
Submitted Sat 05/02/2015
Docket last updated: 05/02/2015 9:53 AM CDT
Monday, November 17, 2014
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (nsf, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by United Airlines, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Orbitz Worldwide, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10069670.(Letchinger, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Letchinger, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, LLC, United Airlines, Inc. by John Sheldon Letchinger (Letchinger, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United Airlines, Inc. (Letchinger, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Orbitz Worldwide, LLC (Letchinger, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Orbitz, LLC (Letchinger, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, LLC, United Airlines, Inc. by Frank T. Blechschmidt (Blechschmidt, Frank)
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, LLC, United Airlines, Inc. by Matthew J Caccamo (Caccamo, Matthew)
Related: [-]