New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Case #: 1:24-cv-00495
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2024
Terminated:Apr 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 21, 2024 6:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Theecode Technologies Private Limited
Plaintiff
PreREO LLC
Represented By
Ramona Veronica Singh
Ahp Servicing LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 01, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/01 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Theecode Technologies Private Limited. Document filed by PreREO LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Singh, Ramona)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 03/18 2:13 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ramona Veronica Singh to RE-FILE re: Document No. 16 Second Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add Theecode Technologies Private Limited 'doing business as Theecode Global, LLc'; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; opposing party did not consent to the amendment of the pleading; the order granting permission to file the pleading was not attached; Court's leave has not been granted. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Second Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/18 2:17 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ramona Veronica Singh to RE-FILE Document No. 17 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the summons request was not processed due to deficient pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
17 17 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Fri 03/15 2:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Theecode Technologies Private Limited d/b/a Theecode Global, LLC, re:10 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint,16 Amended Complaint. Document filed by PreREO LLC..(Singh, Ramona)
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/15 2:20 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending10 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint against Theecode Technologies Private Limited.Document filed by PreREO LLC. Related document:10 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint..(Singh, Ramona)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/14 11:40 AM
ORDER To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of eve1y action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b )(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discove1y through remote means at eve1y available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/14/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/14 11:38 AM
INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by April 9, 2024, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. If this case has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel are required to file a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other proof of termination electronically on ECF, with a courtesy copy emailed to chambers in accordance with the Court's Individual Practices. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/14/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
13 13 3 pgs order Order Wed 02/14 11:37 AM
ORDER To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge.If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by April 9, 2024, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/14/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
12 12 service Amended Summons Issued Tue 02/13 1:38 PM
ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Theecode Technologies Private Limited..(pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Mon 02/12 2:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Theecode Technologies Private Limited, re:10 Amended Complaint. Document filed by PreREO LLC..(Singh, Ramona)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/12 2:56 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint,7 Amended Complaint, against Theecode Technologies Private Limited.Document filed by PreREO LLC. Related document:1 Complaint,7 Amended Complaint,..(Singh, Ramona)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 02/12 2:45 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ramona Veronica Singh to RE-FILE Document No. 7 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 02/12 2:47 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ramona Veronica Singh to RE-FILE Document No. 9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/09 4:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Theecode Technologies Private Limited, re:7 Amended Complaint. Document filed by PreREO LLC..(Singh, Ramona)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/09 4:28 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PreREO LLC..(Singh, Ramona)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/09 4:26 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against PreREO LLC.Document filed by PreREO LLC. Related document:1 Complaint..(Singh, Ramona)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 01/31 2:32 PM
ORDER: By February 9, 2024, Plaintiff shall amend its pleading to allege the citizenship of each constituent person or entity. See Handelsman v. Bedford Vill. Assocs. Ltd. Pship, 213 F.3d 48, 51-52 (2d Cir. 2000) (citing Cosgrove v. Bartolotta, 150 F.3d 729, 731 (7th Cir. 1998)); Bayreische Landesbank, N.Y. Branch v. Aladdin Capital Mgmt. LLC, 692 F.3d 42, 49 (2d Cir. 2012) ("[D]iversity is lacking... where on one side there are citizens and [noncitizens] and on the opposite side there are only [noncitizens]."); id. ("[A] limited liability company... takes the citizenship of each of its members."). If Plaintiff fails to amend by the foregoing date to truthfully allege complete diversity based upon the citizenship of each constituent person or entity of the LLC, then the complaint will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/9/2024.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/31/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/25 10:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Singh, Ramona)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 01/25 9:15 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Theecode Technologies Private Limited..(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/25 9:03 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Ramona Veronica Singh to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the second page of the PDF was omitted;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 01/25 9:06 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ramona Veronica Singh. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:294; Arbitration code m (Mandatory); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 01/25 9:06 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ramona Veronica Singh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: PreREO LLC; Theecode Technologies Private Limited. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 01/25 9:13 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 01/25 9:14 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 01/25 9:15 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 01/24 11:50 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Theecode Technologies Private Limited, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by PreREO LLC..(Singh, Ramona)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/24 11:46 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Singh, Ramona)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/24 11:41 AM
COMPLAINT against Theecode Technologies Private Limited. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28852393)Document filed by PreREO LLC..(Singh, Ramona)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to File Initial Pleading Wed 01/24 11:07 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ramona Veronica Singh to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 1/29/2024. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/24 11:07 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Ramona Veronica Singh. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
Related: [-]