New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Philip Bentley
Case #: 1:24-bk-10093
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2024

Debtor
Bolster.US, Inc.
132 W 31st St Fl 9
New York, NY 10001-3406
Represented By
Erica Feynman Aisner
Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 01/24/2024 12:13 PM EST
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 01/24 11:02 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-10093 ) [misc,969] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16490215. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
1 1 18 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 01/24 10:37 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Order for Relief Entered. Section 521(i) Incomplete Filing Date: 03/11/2024. Schedule A/B due 02/7/2024. Schedule C due 02/7/2024. Schedule D due 02/7/2024. Schedule E/F due 02/7/2024. Schedule G due 02/7/2024. Schedule H due 02/7/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 02/7/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 02/7/2024. Atty Disclosure State. due 02/7/2024. Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration and Signature Form 119 due 02/7/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement due by: 02/7/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 02/7/2024, Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner of Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP on behalf of Bolster.US, Inc.. (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]