Minnesota District Court
Judge:Eric C Tostrud
Referred: Leo I Brisbois
Case #: 0:24-cv-00186
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2024
Terminated:Jun 06, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 3:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Thom Petersen
Represented By
Oliver J Larson
Minnesota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Christina M Brown
Office Of The Minnesota Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Lance Nistler
Represented By
James V. F. Dickey
Upper Midwest Law Center
contact info
Andrew Quinio
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Joshua P. Thompson
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Tim Walz
Terminated: 02/13/2024
Represented By
Oliver J Larson
Minnesota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Christina M Brown
Office Of The Minnesota Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, June 06, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 06/06 1:46 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 6/6/2024.(RMM)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Thu 06/06 10:46 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re20 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Quinio, Andrew)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 06/06 10:44 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lance Nistler. Jointly Signed by Lance Nistler and Thom Petersen. (Quinio, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/08 3:04 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2024. Fact Discovery due by 12/15/2024. Expert Discovery due by 12/15/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 6/30/2024. Motions (non-disp) due 1/15/2025. Motions (disp) due by 2/15/2025. Ready for trial due by 6/15/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/8/2024.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
18 18 3 pgs misc Statement of Case (cv) Tue 03/26 2:48 PM
STATEMENT OF CASE as to Thom Petersen. (Brown, Christina)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
17 17 misc Report Mon 03/25 5:52 PM
REPORT Joint Rule FRCP 26(f) by Lance Nistler. (Quinio, Andrew)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Statement of Case (cv) Mon 03/25 3:45 PM
STATEMENT OF CASE as to All Plaintiffs. (Quinio, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/28 12:32 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/28/2024.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 The Case for Aggressive Civility,
Att: 2 Consent Form
Thursday, February 15, 2024
14 14 19 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/15 11:53 AM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Thom Petersen, Tim Walz. (Brown, Christina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Parties Tue 02/13 2:28 PM
ORDER DISMISSING Tim Walz (in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Minnesota). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 2/13/2024.(RMM)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Tue 02/13 1:10 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re11 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Quinio, Andrew)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/13 1:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Tim Walz by Lance Nistler. (Quinio, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/05 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Brown on behalf of All Defendants. (Brown, Christina)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/05 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Brown on behalf of All Defendants. (Brown, Christina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/30 11:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lance Nistler. Thom Petersen served on 1/25/2024, answer due 2/15/2024. (Quinio, Andrew)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/30 11:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lance Nistler. Tim Walz served on 1/25/2024, answer due 2/15/2024. (Quinio, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/25 8:18 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew Quinio for Lance Nistler.; granting2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joshua P. Thompson for Lance Nistler. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/25/2024. (jam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 01/24 10:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Thom Petersen, Tim Walz. (ABR)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Wed 01/24 10:26 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (6th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 24-cv-186 (ECT/LIB). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/24 10:15 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua P. Thompson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10793988 filed by Lance Nistler. (Dickey, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/24 10:11 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew R. Quinio. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10793963 filed by Lance Nistler. (Dickey, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/24 9:58 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10793845) filed by Lance Nistler. Filer requests summons issued. (Dickey, James) Modified text on 1/24/2024 (LTT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet