District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Ana C Reyes
Case #: 1:24-cv-00210
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
CauseViol. of the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE-AAJC
Represented By
Matthew E. Kreiser
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
YUHUAN SONG
Represented By
Abdel-Rahman Hamed
Hamed Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Friday, September 27, 2024
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 09/27 3:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by YUHUAN SONG. (Hamed, Abdel-Rahman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Thu 09/26 9:53 PM
Second STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement by YUHUAN SONG. (Hamed, Abdel-Rahman)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 09/06 10:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court ORDERS that on or before September 26, 2024, the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or another joint status report. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 9/6/2024. (lcacr1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to Fri 09/06 10:44 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Settlement by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE-AAJC. (See docket entry12 to view document) (zdp)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Status Report Thu 09/05 2:01 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE-AAJC. (Kreiser, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 08/05 6:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties reaching a settlement in principle, the Court hereby ORDERS that on or before September 5, 2024, the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 8/5/2024. (lc2)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 08/06 10:13 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya: Settlement Conference held on 8/5/2024 and concluded as successful. Settlement in principle reached. (lchk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
11 11 order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 05/22 11:13 AM
MEDIATION ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 8/5/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5- In Person before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on 05/22/2024. (lchk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Thu 05/09 10:56 AM
CASE DIRECTLY REASSIGNED/REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya, by consent, for mediation. (ztnr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
minutes Pre-motion Conference Tue 05/07 12:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ana C. Reyes: Pre-motion Conference held on 5/7/2024. (Court Reporter: Christine Asif) (zcdw)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/07 3:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER. As stated on the record at today's conference, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is REFERRED to a magistrate judge, to be assigned at random by the Clerk's Office, for mediation. It is further ORDERED that, if the magistrate judge's schedule allows, the parties shall participate in a mediation session no later than August 5, 2024. It is further ORDERED that, prior to that session, Plaintiff shall produce the EEOC documents discussed on the record during today's conference. And it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before August 12, 2024. If the parties have not settled the case, the joint status report should include a proposed briefing schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, if any, and three proposed trial dates. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 5/7/2024. (lcsj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Wed 05/08 8:10 AM
CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for Mediation. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 05/02 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pre-motion Conference set for 5/7/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zcdw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
10 10 respm Response to (non-motion) Document Wed 02/14 11:33 PM
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE filed by YUHUAN SONG. (Hamed, Abdel-Rahman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/07 1:37 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to7 due by 2/14/2024. (zcdw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/02 8:51 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Request for Pre-Motion Conference by YUHUAN SONG.(Hamed, Abdel-Rahman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/02 9:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's pre-motion notice on or before February 14, 2024. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 2/2/2024. (lcacr1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
8 8 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Wed 01/31 5:58 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE-AAJC (Kreiser, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/31 4:47 PM
NOTICE Defendant's Request for Pre-Dispositive Motion Conference by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE-AAJC re Order on Motion to Dismiss,, (Kreiser, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss Wed 01/31 12:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint With Prejudice by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE-AAJC.(Kreiser, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 01/31 2:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that Defendant's6 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because Defendant did not comply with the pre-motion conference requirements in Section 7(f) of Judge Reyes's Standing Order, which is available on her webpage. Defendant must comply with Section 7(f) before filing a dispositive motion. Once Defendant files a pre-motion notice, Plaintiff will have one week to respond and then the Court will schedule a pre-motion conference. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 1/31/2024. (lcacr1)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
5 5 misc Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents Mon 01/29 3:41 PM
Receipt on 1/29/2024 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2023-CAB-006859. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel/Party Thu 01/25 12:54 PM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal,(zcb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
3 3 cmp Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED) Thu 01/25 11:35 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE-AAJC filed by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE-AAJC.(Kreiser, Matthew) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/25/2024) (zdp)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Errata Thu 01/25 11:32 AM
ERRATA Local Civ. R. 5.1(c) by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE-AAJC. (Kreiser, Matthew)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of QC- New Case Thu 01/25 10:59 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Notice of Removal; emailed to matthew.kreiser@jacksonlewis.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (cb, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/25 12:46 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zcb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 01/24 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2023-CAB-006859 Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADCDC-10641353 filed by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE-AAJC.(Kreiser, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet