Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Sharion Aycock
Referred: Jane M Virden
Case #: 3:24-cv-00024
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2024
Terminated:Feb 13, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 4:06 AM CDT
Defendant
Thomas Dault, Jr.
Defendant
US Alternator, LLC
Plaintiff
Majestic Mississippi, LLC
Represented By
D. Sterling Kidd
Baker, Donelson, Bearman & Caldwell - Jackson
contact info
Amy Kebert Elder
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
4 4 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/13 1:33 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice . (Kidd, D.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
3 3 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 01/30 3:59 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/30/2024. (bbf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 01/24 12:48 PM
Summons Issued as to Thomas Dault, Jr, US Alternator, LLC. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (lgm)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/24 12:47 PM
COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMSNDC-2345413, filed by Majestic Mississippi, LLC. (lgm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Purchase Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Demand Letter,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Wed 01/24 12:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (lgm)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Correction Wed 01/24 12:54 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE : F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (lgm)
Related: [-]