Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Mary M Rowland
Case #: 1:24-cv-00640
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2024
Terminated:Apr 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 3:52 AM CDT
Defendant
Zhejiang Taizhou Store
Defendant
longmian
Defendant
lizhipingl
Defendant
lai6677
Defendant
kangminghappystyle2023
Defendant
kangming2022
Defendant
ineedmuchmoney
Defendant
iloveaj
Defendant
iamrich
Defendant
happytoto Store
Defendant
fecmper8
Defendant
lovefashion13
Defendant
Youngstore06
Defendant
Youngstore05
Defendant
Yao06
Defendant
YLTCXM Store
Defendant
XinRanAE001 Store
Defendant
WuJiGe Store
Defendant
VOGELLIA Store
Defendant
Us_illinois
Defendant
Unique Rainbow handbag Store
Defendant
UOSU Factory Store
Defendant
topsellerelvis005
Defendant
ziweilin
Defendant
zhichao5
Defendant
yundya0
Defendant
yuliguo5
Defendant
xyppp Official Store
Defendant
xueyuan1
Defendant
xingyunzhixing Store
Defendant
xiaoheclothingstore
Defendant
trapstar5998
Defendant
toryburch_luxurybag
Defendant
UKCF Official Store
Defendant
topsellerelvis004 Store
Defendant
szh18202980027
Defendant
qisehua Store
Defendant
perfect8988
Defendant
outfit1768
Defendant
mywardrobe009
Defendant
min2012
Defendant
lwh19961
Defendant
Mang06
Defendant
Seven blast Niuniu men wear
Defendant
Seg0
Defendant
RongCheng Store
Defendant
Powerstore05
Defendant
Ouzj
Defendant
Nickyoung07
Defendant
Netm
Defendant
NKADQD Official Store
Defendant
Mkn2
Defendant
Shanye06
Defendant
Luo06
Defendant
LONG LEI
Defendant
Jiu06
Defendant
Jia06
Defendant
I9ge
Defendant
BQTXQC
Defendant
The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Defendant
Shop1102881259 Store
Defendant
UFLAME Store
Defendant
TIAOPILAO TIAOPILAO 3 Store
Defendant
Shop911267101 Store
Defendant
Shop911264193 Store
Defendant
Shop5622204 Store
Defendant
Shop5150067 Store
Defendant
Shop4240004 Store_2
Defendant
Shop1102882095 Store
Defendant
Shop1102861668 Store
Defendant
Shop1102738441 Store
Defendant
Shop1102673283 Store
Defendant
Shop1102492036 Store
Defendant
Shop1102412845 Store
Defendant
Shop1102182818 Store
Defendant
Shop1102180530 Store
Defendant
Shop1102145286 Store
Defendant
Shop1102096142 Store
Defendant
Shop1102076108 Store
Plaintiff
Levi Strauss & Co.
Represented By
Quinn Bradley Guillermo
Greer, Burns & Crain
contact info
Justin R. Gaudio
Greer Burns & Crain Ltd
contact info
Rachel S Miller
Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.
contact info
Amy Crout Ziegler
Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
smile bellamy
Terminated: 03/07/2024
Defendant
NIU ZAI
Terminated: 03/14/2024
Defendant
JunZhi Store
Terminated: 03/21/2024
Defendant
JIANGYUANKNA
Terminated: 03/14/2024
Defendant
Solyinne1
Terminated: 03/28/2024


Docket last updated: 01/24/2024 3:50 PM CST
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
1 1 21 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Levi Strauss & Co.; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21563193.(Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
2 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Levi Strauss & Co. Schedule A regarding complaint1 (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Levi Strauss & Co. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
4 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Levi Strauss & Co. (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
6 6 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Levi Strauss & Co. (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Levi Strauss & Co. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Levi Strauss & Co. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
Related: [-]
9 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Levi Strauss & Co. by Rachel S Miller (Miller, Rachel)
Related: [-]
10 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Levi Strauss & Co. by Quinn Bradley Guillermo (Guillermo, Quinn)
Related: [-]