California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:24-cv-00662
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 1:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Phillip J. Ahn
Defendant
B. Riley Financial, Inc.
Represented By
Adam S. Paris
Sullivan And Cromwell LLP
contact info
Diane Lee McGimsey
Sullivan And Cromwell LLP
contact info
Brenna Helene Scully
Sullivan And Cromwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tom Kelleher
Defendant
Bryant Riley
Movant
Chin Legacy Gift Trust UA DTD 03/29/2022
Represented By
James Milligan Wilson, Jr
Faruqoi And Faruqui LLP
contact info
Robert W. Killorin
Faruqi And Faruqi LLP
contact info
Lisa Tamiko Omoto
Faruqi And Faruqi, LLP
contact info
Movant
Chong Legacy Gift Trust UA DTD 03/29/2022
Represented By
James Milligan Wilson, Jr
Faruqoi And Faruqui LLP
contact info
Robert W. Killorin
Faruqi And Faruqi LLP
contact info
Lisa Tamiko Omoto
Faruqi And Faruqi, LLP
contact info
Movant
The KL Kamholz Joint Revocable Trust
Represented By
Jennifer Pafiti
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Justin D D'Aloia
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mike Coan
Represented By
Robert Vincent Prongay
Glancy Prongay And Murray LLP
contact info
Pavithra Rajesh
Glancy Prongay And Murray LLP
contact info
Charles Henry Linehan
Glancy Prongay And Murray LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
106 106 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/29 3:54 PM
ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: granting105 Non-Resident Attorney Guy Yedwab APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff The KL Kamholz Joint Revocable Trust, designating Jennifer Pafiti as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
105 105 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 04/28 12:27 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Guy Yedwab to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff The KL Kamholz Joint Revocable Trust (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39592187) filed by Lead Plaintiff The KL Kamholz Joint Revocable Trust. (Pafiti, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order