Minnesota District Court
Judge:Jerry W Blackwell
Referred: Leo I Brisbois
Case #: 0:24-cv-00194
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12181 Americans with Disabilities Act - Private Entities Definitions
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2024
Terminated:Apr 19, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 3:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Etsy, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Thomas Dufresne
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Clarence Frost
Represented By
Jason D Gustafson
Throndset & Michenfelder Law Office LLC
contact info
Patrick W Michenfelder
Throndset Michenfelder Law Office, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tammy Frost
Represented By
Jason D Gustafson
Throndset & Michenfelder Law Office LLC
contact info
Patrick W Michenfelder
Throndset Michenfelder Law Office, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 19, 2024
19 19 misc Proposed Order to Judge - Other Fri 04/19 1:39 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Notice of Dismissal18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/19 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost (Michenfelder, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 04/04 10:15 AM
ORDER on15 Stipulation. Etsy, Inc. answer due 5/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/4/2024.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
16 16 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Wed 04/03 11:02 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re15 Stipulation. (Dufresne, Andrew)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Stipulation Wed 04/03 11:00 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Etsy, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Plaintiffs Clarence and Tammy Frost. (Dufresne, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
14 14 11 pgs order Order/Notice to Attorney Tue 04/02 1:43 PM
ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Standing Order No. 1: Procedural Requirements for Preliminary and Final Approval of Class Action Settlements. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 4/2/2024.(MSK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 03/20 10:55 AM
ORDER on10 Stipulation. Etsy, Inc. answer due 4/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/20/2024.(JLB)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney Wed 03/20 9:59 AM
(Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Amanda Beane as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (MKB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
11 11 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Tue 03/19 2:43 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re10 Stipulation. (Dufresne, Andrew)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Stipulation Tue 03/19 2:41 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Etsy, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Plaintiffs Clarence and Tammy Frost. (Dufresne, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 02/20 2:21 PM
ORDER on6 Stipulation. Etsy, Inc. answer due 3/21/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/20/2024.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
8 8 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Fri 02/16 10:58 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Etsy, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
7 7 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Thu 02/15 4:01 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re6 Stipulation. (Dufresne, Andrew)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation Thu 02/15 3:44 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Etsy, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Plaintiffs Clarence and Tammy Frost. (Dufresne, Andrew)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/15 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Thomas Dufresne on behalf of Etsy, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/06 3:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost. Etsy, Inc. served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 01/25 11:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Etsy, Inc. (BTX)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Thu 01/25 11:18 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per Civil (5th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 24cv194 (JWB/LIB). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (BTX)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/24 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Etsy, Inc. (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10795800) filed by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost. Filer requests summons issued. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet