Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodolfo A Ruiz, II
Case #: 1:24-cv-20273
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2024
Terminated:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 21, 2024 6:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Arnold Ingram
Defendant
Dana Levine
Defendant
Kimberly McDonald
Defendant
Miami Gardens Police Department
Defendant
Kyron Parker
Plaintiff
Nia Monet Roberts
1540 NW 203rd Street
Miami, FL 33169


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
7 7 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 03/06 1:01 PM
ORDER Dismissing6 Amended Complaint; Dismissing Action (Without Prejudice) ; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 3/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Fri 02/16 3:25 PM
SPECIAL COMPLAINT against Arnold Ingram, Dana Levine, Kimberly McDonald, Miami Gardens Police Department, Kyron Parker filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Nia Monet Roberts.(ls)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
5 5 order Administrative Order Mon 01/29 10:04 AM
ORDER TO AMEND. On or before February 16, 2024, the amended complaint must be docketed, signed under the penalty of perjury, and contain a short and plain statement of a claim for relief, a basis for federal jurisdiction, and a demand for judgment. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/29/2024. See attached document for full details. (mei)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
4 4 misc Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) to receive Notices of Electronic Filing Wed 01/24 8:38 AM
Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Nia Monet Roberts to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: niaroberts1222@gmail.com (drz)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 01/24 8:36 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nia Monet Roberts. (drz)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 01/24 8:35 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/24 8:32 AM
COMPLAINT against Arnold Ingram, Dana Levine, Kimberly McDonald, Miami Gardens Police Department, Kyron Parker. Filing fees $ 405.00. IFP Filed, filed by Nia Monet Roberts.(drz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)