Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott W Everett
Case #: 3:24-bk-30196
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Mar 05, 2024
Terminated:May 20, 2024

Debtor
GG Plastic Surgery Institute
4109 Normandy Ave
Dallas, TX 75205-2037
Represented By
Eric A. Liepins
Eric A. Liepins, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Robert Yaquinto, Jr.
509 N. Montclair
Dallas, TX 75208
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 01/25/2024 12:02 AM CST
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary petition chapter 7 (attorney filer) Wed 01/24 4:20 PM
Non-individual Chapter 7 voluntary petition. Fee Amount $338 Filed by GG Plastic Surgery Institute (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign Wed 01/24 11:01 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/5/2024 at 09:20 AM by TELEPHONE. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]