California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:24-cv-00675
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 1:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Uni Nashville Airport Hotel, LLC
Defendant
SH Nashville, LLC
Defendant
Taylor Woods
an individual 142 E. Clearvue Drive
Meridian, ID 83646
Defendant
Eagle Nashville Airport Hotel, LLC
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Rentas E Inversiones Los Olivos, Ltda.
Represented By
Howard M Zelener
Howard M. Zelener
contact info
Stephen Gerard Larson
Larson LLP
contact info
Paul Anthony Rigali
Larson LLP
contact info
Alix K. Zelener
Larson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sitka Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Howard M Zelener
Howard M. Zelener
contact info
Stephen Gerard Larson
Larson LLP
contact info
Paul Anthony Rigali
Larson LLP
contact info
Alix K. Zelener
Larson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
A Way To Move, Inc.
Represented By
Howard M Zelener
Howard M. Zelener
contact info
Stephen Gerard Larson
Larson LLP
contact info
Paul Anthony Rigali
Larson LLP
contact info
Alix K. Zelener
Larson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Niulpi International SpA
Represented By
Howard M Zelener
Howard M. Zelener
contact info
Stephen Gerard Larson
Larson LLP
contact info
Paul Anthony Rigali
Larson LLP
contact info
Alix K. Zelener
Larson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Link Nashville Airport Hotel, Inc.
Represented By
Howard M Zelener
Howard M. Zelener
contact info
Stephen Gerard Larson
Larson LLP
contact info
Paul Anthony Rigali
Larson LLP
contact info
Alix K. Zelener
Larson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alex Knowles
Represented By
Howard M Zelener
Howard M. Zelener
contact info
Stephen Gerard Larson
Larson LLP
contact info
Paul Anthony Rigali
Larson LLP
contact info
Alix K. Zelener
Larson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Inversiones Baraja Y Compania Sociedad Colectiva Civil
Represented By
Howard M Zelener
Howard M. Zelener
contact info
Stephen Gerard Larson
Larson LLP
contact info
Paul Anthony Rigali
Larson LLP
contact info
Alix K. Zelener
Larson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bidart Dairy II, LLC
Represented By
Howard M Zelener
Howard M. Zelener
contact info
Stephen Gerard Larson
Larson LLP
contact info
Paul Anthony Rigali
Larson LLP
contact info
Alix K. Zelener
Larson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Bidart
Represented By
Howard M Zelener
Howard M. Zelener
contact info
Stephen Gerard Larson
Larson LLP
contact info
Paul Anthony Rigali
Larson LLP
contact info
Alix K. Zelener
Larson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bruce Beretta
Represented By
Howard M Zelener
Howard M. Zelener
contact info
Stephen Gerard Larson
Larson LLP
contact info
Paul Anthony Rigali
Larson LLP
contact info
Alix K. Zelener
Larson LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
John Jenkins, Jr.
Terminated: 04/22/2024
Defendant
Alec Robinson
Terminated: 02/27/2024
Defendant
Urban Commons, LLC
Terminated: 05/29/2024
Defendant
Annie Wu
Terminated: 04/30/2024
Defendant
Howard Wu
Terminated: 02/23/2024
Defendant
Douglas Kiel
Terminated: 04/05/2024
Represented By
Robert June-Yong Im
Mcglinchey Stafford
contact info
Defendant
Frank Yuan
Terminated: 04/11/2024
Represented By
Manuel A. Abascal
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Ryan Arber Walsh
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Alexander Wyman
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jerome Yuan
Terminated: 04/11/2024
Represented By
Manuel A. Abascal
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Ryan Arber Walsh
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Alexander Wyman
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Norbert Yuan
Terminated: 04/11/2024
Represented By
Manuel A. Abascal
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Ryan Arber Walsh
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Alexander Wyman
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
ASAP Property Holdings, Inc.
Terminated: 04/11/2024
Represented By
Manuel A. Abascal
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Ryan Arber Walsh
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Alexander Wyman
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
ASAP International Hotel, LLC
Terminated: 04/11/2024
Represented By
Manuel A. Abascal
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Ryan Arber Walsh
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Alexander Wyman
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, December 13, 2024
71 71 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 12/13 3:40 PM
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court, having considered Plaintiffs' request, hereby orders as follows: 1. Plaintiffs shall have until January 20, 2025 to move to enter default judgments against Defendants Uni Nashville, LLC, Eagle Nashville, LLC, SH Nashville, LLC. 2. The November 27, 2024 Order To Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed For Lack Of Prosecution is vacated. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
70 70 misc Response Fri 12/06 2:24 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Link Nashville Airport Hotel, Inc., Alex Knowles, A Way To Move, Inc., John Bidart, Bidart Dairy II, LLC, Bruce Beretta, Sitka Enterprises, LLC, Rentas E Inversiones Los Olivos, Ltda., Niulpi International SpA, Inversiones Baraja Y Compania Sociedad Colectiva Civilto Order to Show Cause,,69 (Larson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order